This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2020 at 09:50:43 (UTC).

Rene Cazares v. J. Pickett

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Rene Cazares filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against J Pickett. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09193

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rene Cazares

Susanville, CA 96127

Respondent

J. Pickett

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #4 REQUEST for Enlargement of Time to File. Petitioner shall file his response to the October 14, 2020 Order to Show Cause no later than January 16, 2021. (hr) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST for Enlargement of Time filed by Petitioner Rene Cazares. (hr) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

3 #2

Blank Notice of Dismissal Form

3 #1

Blank State Habeas Petition Form

#3

(#3) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before November 13, 2020 why the Petition should not be dismissed. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank State Habeas Petition Form, #2 Blank Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Rene Cazares. (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #4 REQUEST for Enlargement of Time to File. Petitioner shall file his response to the October 14, 2020 Order to Show Cause no later than January 16, 2021. (hr) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST for Enlargement of Time filed by Petitioner Rene Cazares. (hr) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before November 13, 2020 why the Petition should not be dismissed. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank State Habeas Petition Form, #2 Blank Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Rene Cazares. (ghap) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less