This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:39:07 (UTC).

Rendic v. Minor et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Rendic filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Minor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark Waddoups. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00150

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clark Waddoups

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Dino Rendic

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Todd Hunter

Carter Rush Pilcher Minor

Kramerica Industries of Idaho

Kramerica Industries of Idaho doing business as Idaho Lumber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Clayton A. Simms

341 S Main Ste 500

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Andrew B. McDaniel

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Andrew D. Wright

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

9350 S 150 E Ste 820

Sandy, UT 84070

Matthew B. Purcell

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Sarah E. Spencer

Attorney at CHRISTENSEN & JENSEN PC

257 E 200 S Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Dino Rendic filed by Carter Rush Pilcher Minor. (Purcell, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS TODD HUNTER AND KRAMERICAINDUSTRIES OF IDAHO, LLC- re #9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Todd Hunter. Kramerica Industries of Idaho, Todd Hunter and Todd Hunter terminated. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/24/20. (jrj) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Todd Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #3 Counterclaim Todd Hunter filed by Dino Rendic.(Simms, Clayton) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting Stipulated #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline updated for Carter Rush Pilcher Minor answer due 3/26/2020. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/17/20. (jrj) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant Carter Rush Pilcher Minor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Purcell, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

5 #4

NEF

5 #2

NEF

5 #1

Complaint

#3

(#3) Defendant Hunter's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against Dino Rendic filed by Todd Hunter.(McDaniel, Andrew) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

2 #5

Exhibit Report from Bernhardt

2 #4

Exhibit Declaration of Todd Hunter

2 #3

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

2 #2

Exhibit Notice of Removal

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 200900152, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3515055) filed by Todd Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Todd Hunter, #5 Exhibit Report from Bernhardt) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (McDaniel, Andrew) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Dino Rendic filed by Carter Rush Pilcher Minor. (Purcell, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS TODD HUNTER AND KRAMERICAINDUSTRIES OF IDAHO, LLC- re #9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Todd Hunter. Kramerica Industries of Idaho, Todd Hunter and Todd Hunter terminated. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/24/20. (jrj) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Todd Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #3 Counterclaim Todd Hunter filed by Dino Rendic.(Simms, Clayton) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting Stipulated #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline updated for Carter Rush Pilcher Minor answer due 3/26/2020. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/17/20. (jrj) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant Carter Rush Pilcher Minor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Purcell, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) File Received from Third District Court-Salt Lake. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 NEF, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 NEF) (jrj) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Todd Hunter, Kramerica Industries of Idaho, Carter Rush Pilcher Minor, Plaintiff Dino Rendic. (nl) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant Hunter's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Defendant's COUNTERCLAIM against Dino Rendic filed by Todd Hunter.(McDaniel, Andrew) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 200900152, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3515055) filed by Todd Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Todd Hunter, #5 Exhibit Report from Bernhardt) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (McDaniel, Andrew) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Defendant Todd Hunter is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less