This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/16/2019 at 07:55:00 (UTC).

Remi Holdings, LLC v. Neathamer et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Remi Holdings, LLC filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Neathamer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Max O. Cogburn, Jr and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00542

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Max O. Cogburn, Jr

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Remi Holdings, LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Thomas and Associates, LLC

William Thomas Neathamer, III

Melissa Hughes

Brian Gibbs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Evan Margosian Sauda

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

301 South College Street, Suite 2300

Charlotte, NC 28202

Ariel Elisa Harris

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

301 South College Street, Suite 2300

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ashley B. Bartolucci

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.

11215 North Community House Road, Suite 750

Charlotte, NC 28277

Richard N. Sheinis

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.

11215 North Community House Road, Suite 750, Suite 175

Charlotte, NC 28277

Patrick Chinnery

Attorney at Pepper Law, PLC

201 Fourth Avenue North, Suite 1550

Nashville, TN 37219

J. Ross Pepper

Attorney at Pepper Law, PLC

201 Fourth Avenue North, Suite 1550

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

8 #2

Exhibit Proposed Amended Counterclaim

8 #1

Memorandum in Support of Permissive Joinder

#8

#7

6 #2

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Melissa Hughes

6 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#6

5 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to Resp

#5

3 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick Chin

#3

1 #4

Exhibit C - Memorandum in Support of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit A - Entire Court File

1 #1

Appendix Index of Exhibits to Notice of Removal

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice to Patrick Chinnery: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/9/2019. (mek) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Patrick Chinnery for Melissa Hughes,William Thomas Neathamer, III,and Thomas and Associates, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/2/2019. (mek) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 MOTION for Joinder of Proposed Counter-Defendant Daniel Schuster, and to respond to #7 Defendant's Counterclaim. Responses due by 12/20/2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/02/2019. (DLG) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Remi Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 12/16/2019 (Harris, Ariel). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Joinder of Proposed Counter-Defendant Daniel Schuster by Thomas and Associates, LLC. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Permissive Joinder, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Counterclaim)(Pepper, J.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Thomas and Associates, LLC, Neathamer and Gibbs's ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal,, Thomas and Associates, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Remi Holdings, LLC by Thomas and Associates, LLC, William Thomas Neathamer, III, Brian Gibbs.(Pepper, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Melissa Hughes. Responses due by 12/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Melissa Hughes)(Pepper, J.) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants' answer due 11/22/2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/24/2019. (DLG) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Brian Gibbs, Melissa Hughes, William Thomas Neathamer, III, Thomas and Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Bartolucci, Ashley). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice to J. Ross Pepper: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/25/2019. (mek) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added J. Ross Pepper for Brian Gibbs, Melissa Hughes, William Thomas Neathamer, III and Thomas and Associates, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/18/2019. (mek) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick Chinnery Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4226435. by Brian Gibbs, Melissa Hughes, William Thomas Neathamer, III, Thomas and Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick Chinnery)(Bartolucci, Ashley). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Ross Pepper Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4226058. by Brian Gibbs, Melissa Hughes, William Thomas Neathamer, III, Thomas and Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Ross Pepper)(Bartolucci, Ashley). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from State of North Carolina Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-18728. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4224242), filed by Thomas and Associates, LLC, William Thomas Neathamer, III, Brian Gibbs, Melissa Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Entire Court File, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C - Memorandum in Support of Notice of Removal)(Bartolucci, Ashley) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMAS & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Margosian Sauda