This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2020 at 07:06:29 (UTC).

Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC. v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Rejoice Coffee Company, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-06789

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC, a California limited liability company

Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC.

Defendants

The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation

Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., a Connecticut corporation

Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.

The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Michael Birka-White

Attorney at Birka-White Law Offices

178 E. Prospect Avenue

Danville, CA 94526

Daniel Louis Rottinghaus

Attorney at Berding & Weil LLP

2175 N. California Blvd., Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Robert Steven Robinson

Attorney at Birka-White Law Offices

178 E. Prospect Avenue

Danville, CA 94526

Fredrick Arthur Hagen

Attorney at Berding & Weil LLP

2175 N. California Blvd., Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

John D Green

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

Alyson M Zureick

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Alan Evan Schoenfeld

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich St.

New York, NY 10007

Ryan Michael Chabot

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center

New York, NY 10007

Anthony John Anscombe

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Johanna Oh

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

27 #4

Exhibit D

27 #3

Exhibit C

27 #2

Exhibit B

27 #1

Exhibit A

#27

(#27) Request for Judicial Notice re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Restitution (Unjust Enrichment) and Violation of the Unfair Competition Law Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed bySentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Anscombe, Anthony) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

26 #1

Proposed Order

#26

(#26) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Restitution (Unjust Enrichment) and Violation of the Unfair Competition Law Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/9/2020. Replies due by 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anscombe, Anthony) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna Oh on Behalf of Defendants The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. and Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (Oh, Johanna) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15197425.) filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Chabot, Ryan) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC... (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#8

(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 01:30 PM. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC, a California limited liability company identifying Other Affiliate Beau Hanson, Other Affiliate John Krause, Other Affiliate LeeAnn Krause, Other Affiliate Thomas and Veronica Grimm Charitable Remainder Unitrust for Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND For Restitution (Unjust Enrichment) and Violation of the Unfair Competition Law against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-15001577). Filed by Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/29/2020) Modified on 9/30/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Request for Judicial Notice re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Restitution (Unjust Enrichment) and Violation of the Unfair Competition Law Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed bySentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Anscombe, Anthony) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Restitution (Unjust Enrichment) and Violation of the Unfair Competition Law Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/9/2020. Replies due by 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anscombe, Anthony) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna Oh on Behalf of Defendants The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. and Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (Oh, Johanna) (Filed on 11/25/2020) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15197425.) filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Chabot, Ryan) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15197353.) filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Zureick, Alyson) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15197298.) filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Schoenfeld, Alan) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/6/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020) (Entered: 11/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 10/6/2020) Modified on 10/7/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC... (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 01:30 PM. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC, a California limited liability company identifying Other Affiliate Beau Hanson, Other Affiliate John Krause, Other Affiliate LeeAnn Krause, Other Affiliate Thomas and Veronica Grimm Charitable Remainder Unitrust for Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/14/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/29/2020) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND For Restitution (Unjust Enrichment) and Violation of the Unfair Competition Law against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-15001577). Filed by Rejoice! Coffee Company, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/29/2020) Modified on 9/30/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MICHAEL CHABOT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Anscombe