This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2021 at 09:12:47 (UTC).

REITMEIER et al v. OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 REITMEIER filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is HUGH LAWSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00094

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUGH LAWSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RYAN REITMEIER

MORGAN MCINTOSH

Defendants

OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC

OS RESTAURANT SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER B HALL

400 Galleria Pkwy, Ste 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

Christopher B. Hall

400 Galleria Pkwy, Ste 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

BRITTANY ANN BARTO

400 Galleria Pkwy Ste 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Summons to Defendant

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Summons

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by RYAN REITMEIER, MORGAN MCINTOSH as to OS RESTAURANT SERVICES LLC. (BARTO, BRITTANY) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to OS RESTAURANT SERVICES LLC. (rlw) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED #1 Complaint, against OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC by RYAN REITMEIER, MORGAN MCINTOSH (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BARTO, BRITTANY) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by RYAN REITMEIER, MORGAN MCINTOSH as to OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC. (BARTO, BRITTANY) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC. (rlw) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by MORGAN MCINTOSH, RYAN REITMEIER ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(rlw) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ryan Reitmeier, Morgan McIntosh Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3847213, $402 filed by Ryan Reitmeier, Morgan McIntosh (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Defendant)(BARTO, BRITTANY) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OS RESTAURANT SERVICES LLC DOING BUSINESS AS CARRABBA'S ITALIAN GRILL is a litigant

Latest cases where OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany Ann Barto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Baker Hall