This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 05:23:35 (UTC).

Lea Reis v. Hyundai Motor America et al

Case Summary

On July 28, 2022, Lea Reis (“Plaintiff””), represented by Alison M. Bernal of Nye Stirling Hale and Miller LLP, filed a labor lawsuit against Hyundai Motor America and Hyundai Motor Company (collectively, “Defendants” or “Hyundai”), seeking declaratory, injunctive relief, and damages for alleged sales of Class Vehicles that were manufactured, in part, using child labor. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California.

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “On or about July 22, 2022, various news outlets reported that underage workers, in some cases as young as 11 years old, have recently worked at SMART’s Montgomery, Alabama metal stamping plant.”

The plaintiff alleged, “Reuters reported that the exact number of underage workers at the SMART plant is unknown, but at least three underage employees have been identified as having recently worked at the plant this year and were not attending school.”

The plaintiff further alleged, “Reuters further reported that based upon dozens of interviews with former and current SMART employees, these three identified underage employees were part of a larger cohort consisting of as many as 50 underage workers at the SMART plant, many of whom have ceased attending school in order to work long shifts at the plant.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “Prior to the revelation that it employed underage workers, SMART complained in late 2020 that its Montgomery, Alabama plant was severely lacking in labor and that Hyundai would not tolerate such shortcomings. Upon information and belief, as a solution, Defendants presumably resorted to illegally hiring underage workers to cure its staffing woes in the SMART plant.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “Notwithstanding their awareness of child labor used at SMART’s plant to manufacture parts for Hyundai Vehicles, Defendants did not disclose this to current or former purchasers or lessees of Class Vehicles. Instead, in the Human Rights Policy of Hyundai Motor Company, available on its website, HMC advertises to consumers that it prohibits the use of child laborers throughout its workforce, including its suppliers.”

The plaintiff presented four claims for relief, including violations of California’s Consumer Legal Remedies Act (“CLRA”), The California Unfair Competition Law, California False Advertising Law, and Fraudulent concealment under the Common Law of California. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a judgment seeking to determine that the claims alleged herein may be maintained as a class action under Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and issue an order certifying one or more Classes. The plaintiff further requested injunctive and/or declaratory relief, damages, reasonable attorneys’ fees, and costs. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01405

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lea Reis

Defendants

Hyundai Motor America

Hyundai Motor Company, -

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alison M. Bernal

Attorney at Nye Stirling Hale and Miller LLP

33 West Mission Street Suite 201

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33716489 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis. (Attorney Alison M. Bernal added to party Lea Reis(pty:pla))(Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis. (Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis, identifying Lea Reis. (Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis. (Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis. (Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor Company. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph G Sauder on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew D. Schelkopf on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Lea Reis re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis (Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

1 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Lea Reis re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis (Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew D. Schelkopf on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph G Sauder on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor Company. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis. (Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis. (Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis, identifying Lea Reis. (Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis. (Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33716489 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Lea Reis. (Attorney Alison M. Bernal added to party Lea Reis(pty:pla))(Bernal, Alison) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less