This case was last updated from PACER on 03/01/2021 at 07:09:00 (UTC).

Reiner v. Nakhleh et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 Reiner filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Nakhleh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison H. Goddard and Todd W. Robinson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02539

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison H. Goddard

Presiding Judge

Todd W. Robinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin Reiner

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendants

Joseph Adams

Rancho Mall LLC

Jenny Hua

DOES 1 to 10

Vickie Grasu

Anastacia Osbrink

Elias Nakhleh

Brookfield Properties Inc.

Travelers Insurance Company

Elite Restaurant Group, Inc.

O'Hagan Meyer

Kimberly Howatt

QIC US Management Inc.

William O'Hare

Slater's 50/50 Franchise LLC

Michael Nakhleh

Allison Jones

Elizabeth Weldon

Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

5 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Transfer Letter Received from Central District of California. Case number in other court is 2:21-cv-00528 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Joseph Adams, Brookfield Properties Inc., DOES 1 to 10, Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP, Vickie Grasu, Kimberly Howatt, Jenny Hua, Allison Jones, Geoff Lee, O'Hagan Meyer, Elias Nakhleh, Michael Nakhleh, William O'Hare, Anastacia Osbrink, Christine Pham, QIC US Management Inc., Rancho Mall LLC, Slater's 50/50 Franchise LLC, Snell & Wilmer LLP, Travelers Insurance Company, Victory Park Capital Advisors LLC, Elizabeth Weldon, Mazyar Yaghoubian ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS126587.), filed by Martin Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2539-AHG. Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard is assigned to the case.(smd) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Transfer Letter Received from Central District of California. Case number in other court is 2:21-cv-00528 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred to District of United States District Court for the Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *United States District Court for the Central District of California, Western Division*.*350 West 1st Street STE 4311, 4th Floor**Los Angeles, CA 90012-4565*. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmr) (jms). (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Joseph Adams, Brookfield Properties Inc., DOES 1 to 10, Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP, Vickie Grasu, Kimberly Howatt, Jenny Hua, Allison Jones, Geoff Lee, O'Hagan Meyer, Elias Nakhleh, Michael Nakhleh, William O'Hare, Anastacia Osbrink, Christine Pham, QIC US Management Inc., Rancho Mall LLC, Slater's 50/50 Franchise LLC, Snell & Wilmer LLP, Travelers Insurance Company, Victory Park Capital Advisors LLC, Elizabeth Weldon, Mazyar Yaghoubian ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS126587.), filed by Martin Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2539-AHG. Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard is assigned to the case.(smd) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Slater's 50/50 Franchise, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Elite Restaurant Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Brookfield Properties Inc. is a litigant