This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/27/2023 at 07:23:58 (UTC).

Rein v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 Rein filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. Whelan and Allison H. Goddard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01856

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. Whelan

Referral Judge

Allison H. Goddard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luann Rein

Defendants

United States of America

San Diego Regional Airport Authority

Does 1 to 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lincoln V Horton

Defendant Attorneys

U S Attorney CV

Janet A Cabral

Christian W. Schmitthenner

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by San Diego Regional Airport Authority. (Schmitthenner, Christian)Attorney Christian W. Schmitthenner added to party San Diego Regional Airport Authority(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#4

(#4) *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 5 **** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Luann Rein.New Summons Requested. (Horton, Lincoln) QC email, missing case number on amended complaint. (dlg). Modified on 1/24/2023 (dlg). (Entered: 01/15/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Errata and Withdrawal of First Amended Complaint to Refile with Case Number per Clerk's Order by Luann Rein re #4 Amended Complaint (Horton, Lincoln) (dlg). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Luann Rein.New Summons Requested. (Horton, Lincoln) (dlg). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued re Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dlg) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#8

(#8) Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant United States to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration Janet Cabral)(Cabral, Janet)Attorney Janet A Cabral added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (exs). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

8 #1

Declaration Janet Cabral

#9

(#9) Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant United States to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint: Answer by Respondent due 2/17/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 1/25/2023. (exs) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant United States to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint: Answer by Respondent due 2/17/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 1/25/2023. (exs) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant United States to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration Janet Cabral)(Cabral, Janet)Attorney Janet A Cabral added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (exs). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued re Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dlg) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Luann Rein.New Summons Requested. (Horton, Lincoln) (dlg). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Errata and Withdrawal of First Amended Complaint to Refile with Case Number per Clerk's Order by Luann Rein re #4 Amended Complaint (Horton, Lincoln) (dlg). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 5 **** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Luann Rein.New Summons Requested. (Horton, Lincoln) QC email, missing case number on amended complaint. (dlg). Modified on 1/24/2023 (dlg). (Entered: 01/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by San Diego Regional Airport Authority. (Schmitthenner, Christian)Attorney Christian W. Schmitthenner added to party San Diego Regional Airport Authority(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against San Diego Regional Airport Authority, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-17373437). Filed by Luann Rein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-1856-W-AHG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Horton, Lincoln)(sjt) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less