This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2021 at 08:09:12 (UTC).

Reilly et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 Reilly filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04173

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brendan Reilly

Tiffany Reilly

Defendant

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric C. Schulte

Defendant Attorneys

Deani Beard Milano

Richard J. Rylance, II

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

AO 85

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Deani Beard Milano for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/2/20. (SLW) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/2/20. (SLW) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Attorney Deani Beard Milano to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3436676) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rylance, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to Extend Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company's Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rylance, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Rylance, II on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rylance, Richard) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Larry D. Deiter, Director Acknowledgement filed by Brendan Reilly, Tiffany Reilly. (Schulte, Eric) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SLW) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3424817, in shell case on 11/6/2020 filed by Brendan Reilly, Tiffany Reilly. (SLW) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less