This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2022 at 08:43:33 (UTC).

Reiffer v. Keller Williams Realty, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 Reiffer filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Keller Williams Realty, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James R. Nowlin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Nowlin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Reiffer

Defendant

Keller Williams Realty, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel Benjamin Rothman

Attorney at SRIPLAW

21301 Powerline Road, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33433

Craig Anthony Wirth

Attorney at SRIPLAW

21301 Powerline Road, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33433

Defendant Attorneys

Darlene Ghavimi

Attorney at K&L Gates

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 350

Austin, TX 78746

Stewart Mesher

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 650

Austin, TX 78746

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15725870), filed by Paul Reiffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wirth, Craig) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Registration

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Infringement

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Paul Reiffer. (Wirth, Craig) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (dl) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#4

(#4) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties by Paul Reiffer. (Wirth, Craig) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Reiffer. Keller Williams Realty, Inc. served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Wirth, Craig) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darlene Ghavimi on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. Attorney Darlene Ghavimi added to party Keller Williams Realty, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Keller Williams Realty, Inc. answer due 4/25/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (so) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (so) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Keller Williams Realty, Inc. answer due 4/25/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darlene Ghavimi on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. Attorney Darlene Ghavimi added to party Keller Williams Realty, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ghavimi, Darlene) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Reiffer. Keller Williams Realty, Inc. served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Wirth, Craig) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties by Paul Reiffer. (Wirth, Craig) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (dl) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Paul Reiffer. (dl) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (dl) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Paul Reiffer. (Wirth, Craig) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15725870), filed by Paul Reiffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wirth, Craig) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Keller Williams Realty, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stewart N Mesher(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darlene Ghavimi