This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2021 at 11:20:18 (UTC).

REID v. MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 REID filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00259

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mr. Carl M. Reid, III

CARL M REID, III

Defendants

MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD

MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD doing business as MIDDLE FLINT BEHAVIORIAL HEALTHCARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALFREDA LYNETTE SHEPPARD

Po Box 2008

Albany, GA 31702

Defendant Attorneys

TERRY LYNN LONG

288 S Main St, Ste 100

Alpharetta, GA 30009

Annarita L McGovern

288 S Main St, Ste 100

Alpharetta, GA 30009

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Required Form

#5

(#5) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/22/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 1/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD with Jury Demand.(McGovern, Annarita)Attorney Annarita L McGovern added to party MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD(pty:dft) (Entered: 01/16/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARL M REID, III as to MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD. (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD. (mdm) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Right To Sue

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Carl M. Reid, III Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3661491, $402 filed by Carl M. Reid, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right To Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/22/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 1/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD with Jury Demand.(McGovern, Annarita)Attorney Annarita L McGovern added to party MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD(pty:dft) (Entered: 01/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #3 Summons Returned Executed filed by CARL M REID, III ); Wrong event used - No need to refile. The correct event is Acknowledgment of Service.(mdm) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARL M REID, III as to MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD. (SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to MIDDLE FLINT AREA COMMUNITY SERVICE BOARD. (mdm) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Carl M. Reid, III Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3661491, $402 filed by Carl M. Reid, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right To Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(SHEPPARD, ALFREDA) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Annarita L. McGovern

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry L. Long