This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2023 at 14:15:39 (UTC).

Reid v. Mckelvey et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 Reid filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mckelvey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ona T. Wang and Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10708

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ona T. Wang

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessica Nicole Reid

Defendants

Leonard Larry Mckelvey

Iheartmedia, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Michael J Grygiel

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Iheartmedia, Inc., Leonard Larry Mckelvey. Document filed by Jessica Nicole Reid..(rdz) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET.(rdz) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 1/26/2023. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/26/2023. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/27/2022) (sha) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#4

Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers). Transmitted re: #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to the Finance Unit (Cashiers) for case processing..(rdz) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Iheartmedia, Inc. waiver sent on 12/21/2022, answer due 2/21/2023; Leonard Larry Mckelvey waiver sent on 12/21/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. Document filed by Jessica Nicole Reid. (sc) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants Leonard Larry McKelvey, professionally known as Charlamagne tha God, and iHeartMedia, Inc. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/15/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation): All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/15/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER: By separate Order being entered today, this case is being referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for a report and recommendation on any motion for judgment on the pleadings. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this order (and also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/consent-proceed-us-magistrate-judge). If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks on which Defendant enters an appearance, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/15/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#10

(#10) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel who have entered an appearance as of the date of this order are directed to notify all other parties' attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must send a copy of this order to that party personally. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/3/2023 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 2/16/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

11 #11

Main Document

11 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit

11 #2

Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing

11 #3

Exhibit C - Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Supplement

#13

(#13) INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Jessica Nicole Reid, at 7474 Creedmoor Rd Box 218, Raleigh, NC 27613, on 2/16/2023 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 2 Summons(es) mailed. (sha) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Jessica Nicole Reid, at 7474 Creedmoor Rd Box 218, Raleigh, NC 27613, on 2/16/2023 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 2 Summons(es) mailed. (sha) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iheartmedia, Inc., Leonard Larry Mckelvey. (sha) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Michael E. Weinsten to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27353761. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Leonard Larry Mckelvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order).(Grygiel, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel who have entered an appearance as of the date of this order are directed to notify all other parties' attorneys in this action by serving upon each of them a copy of this order. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must send a copy of this order to that party personally. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/3/2023 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 2/16/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketMAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 9. Mailed to: Jessica Nicole Reid 7474 Creedmoor Rd Box 218 Raleigh, NC 27613. (kh) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketMAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 8. Mailed to: Jessica Nicole Reid 7474 Creedmoor Rd Box 218 Raleigh, NC 27613. (kh) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: By separate Order being entered today, this case is being referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for a report and recommendation on any motion for judgment on the pleadings. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this order (and also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/consent-proceed-us-magistrate-judge). If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks on which Defendant enters an appearance, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/15/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation): All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/15/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants Leonard Larry McKelvey, professionally known as Charlamagne tha God, and iHeartMedia, Inc. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendants or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/15/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Iheartmedia, Inc. waiver sent on 12/21/2022, answer due 2/21/2023; Leonard Larry Mckelvey waiver sent on 12/21/2022, answer due 2/21/2023. Document filed by Jessica Nicole Reid. (sc) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) in the amount of $402.00, paid on 12/29/2022,improper payment being returned on 12/30/2022: tracking number: 7019 0700 0000 1508 0585, pursing transmission to Finance Unit..(prs) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers). Transmitted re: #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to the Finance Unit (Cashiers) for case processing..(rdz) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE: No summons shall issue at this time. The Court directs Plaintiff, within thirty days of the date of this order, to pay the $402.00 in fees by using one of the acceptable forms of payment noted above. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed. The Finance Department is directed to return the $402.00 personal check to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962) (holding that appellant demonstrates good faith when seeking review of a nonfrivolous issue).SO ORDERED. Filing Fee due by 1/30/2023. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/30/2023. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/29/22) (rdz) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDeficient Pro Se Payment of Fee Received Incorrect Payment Type received by the Finance Department on 12/29/2022, in the amount of $402.00. Payment will be held by the Finance Office pending further order of the Court. (prs) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketMAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Jessica Nicole Reid 7474 Creedmoor Rd Box 218 Raleigh, NC 27613. (ok) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 1/26/2023. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/26/2023. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/27/2022) (sha) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET.(rdz) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Iheartmedia, Inc., Leonard Larry Mckelvey. Document filed by Jessica Nicole Reid..(rdz) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less