This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2020 at 09:41:19 (UTC).

Reid v. Erskine et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Reid filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Erskine. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Phil Gilbert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00706

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Corey Reid

Thomson, IL 61285

Defendants

Mullins

Mayberry

Wolf

Lt. Erskine

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to United States District for Northern District of Illinois - Western Division. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/21/2020. (jsy) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 07/20/2020. Consent due by 8/10/2020. (jsm2) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 20-cv-706-JPG. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $400.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/20/2020. (jsm2) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Corey Reid.(jsm2) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE : Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Northern District of Illinois - CM/ECF LIVE, Ver 6.3.3 as case 1:20-cv-04294, filed 07/22/2020. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket(#5) DOCKET ANNOTATION - Case electronically transferred to the NDIL this date. (jaj) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to United States District for Northern District of Illinois - Western Division. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/21/2020. (jsy) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 07/20/2020. Consent due by 8/10/2020. (jsm2) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 20-cv-706-JPG. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $400.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/20/2020. (jsm2) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Corey Reid.(jsm2) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mayberry is a litigant

Latest cases where MULLINS is a litigant

Latest cases where Wolf, Dr is a litigant