Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 08:30:00 (UTC).

Reid v. Allied Revenue Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 Reid filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Allied Revenue Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Janet T. Neff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerome Reid

Defendants

Allied Revenue Services, LLC

Allied Revenue Services, LLC doing business as Allied Business Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Lewis Greenwald

Attorney at Greenwald Davidson Radbil PLLC

7601 N Federal Highway, Ste. A-230

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Andrew Lloyd Campbell

Attorney at Andrew L. Campbell Attorney at Law

653 S Saginaw St., Ste. 201

Flint, MI 48502

James Lee Davidson

Attorney at Greenwald Davidson Radbil PLLC

7601 N Federal Hwy., Ste. A-230

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey David Koelzer

Attorney at Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett LLP (Grand Rapids)

333 Bridge St., Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

Steven T. Buquicchio

Attorney at Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett LLP (Grand Rapids)

333 Bridge St., Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

Thomas A. Schramm

Attorney at Starr Butler Alexopoulos & Stoner PLLC

20700 Civic Center Dr., Ste. 290

Southfield, MI 48076

Scott D. Stoner

Attorney at Starr Butler Alexopoulos & Stoner PLLC

20700 Civic Center Dr., Ste. 290

Southfield, MI 48076

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting proposed stipulated order #8 ; Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos & Stoner, PLLC is substituted in the place and stead of Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett LLP as counsel for Defendant; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED ORDER regarding Substitution of Counsel by defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Schramm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting STIPULATION to extend time #6 ; Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading due no later than 4/6/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Koelzer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE to attorney James Lee Davidson regarding recent filing #4 (ems) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jerome Reid for Summons and Class Action Complaint (Davidson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (ems) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - October 28, 2019 Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Allied Revenue Services, LLC filed by Jerome Reid (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 28, 2019 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Greenwald, Michael) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (ems). (Entered: 01/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting proposed stipulated order #8 ; Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos & Stoner, PLLC is substituted in the place and stead of Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett LLP as counsel for Defendant; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott D. Stoner on behalf of defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Stoner, Scott) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED ORDER regarding Substitution of Counsel by defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Schramm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas A. Schramm on behalf of defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Schramm, Thomas) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting STIPULATION to extend time #6 ; Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading due no later than 4/6/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Koelzer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Steven T. Buquicchio on behalf of defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Buquicchio, Steven) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeffrey David Koelzer on behalf of defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Koelzer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to attorney James Lee Davidson regarding recent filing #4 (ems) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS returned executed; Allied Revenue Services, LLC served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020 (as taken from #4 ) (ems) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (ems). (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jerome Reid for Summons and Class Action Complaint (Davidson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew Lloyd Campbell on behalf of plaintiff Jerome Reid (Campbell, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James Lee Davidson on behalf of plaintiff Jerome Reid (Davidson, James) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (ems) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jerome Reid in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4859159 (Greenwald, Michael) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Allied Revenue Services, LLC filed by Jerome Reid (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 28, 2019 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Greenwald, Michael) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (ems). (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L Davidson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael L Greenwald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew L Campbell