This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 19:13:47 (UTC).

Reichert v. Netgain Technology, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 Reichert filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Netgain Technology, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud, Leo I. Brisbois and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01300

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leo I. Brisbois

Presiding Judges

Eric C. Tostrud

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan M. Reichert

Defendant

Netgain Technology, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher P Renz

Attorney at Chestnut Cambronne PA

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 1700

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Jeffrey D. Bores

Attorney at Chestnut Cambronne PA

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 1700

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Anne T Regan

Attorney at Hellmuth & Johnson

8050 West 78Th St.

Edina, MN 55439

Nathan D Prosser

Attorney at Hellmuth & Johnson PLLC

8050 West 78Th Street

Edina, MN 55439

Bryan L. Bleichner

Attorney at Chestnut Cambronne PA

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 1700

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Justin C Walker

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Terence Coates

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1300 (SRN/LIB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 6/17/2021 and Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 6/21/2021.(MKB) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Terence R. Coates. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8792392 filed by Susan M. Reichert. (Bleichner, Bryan) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin C. Walker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8792365 filed by Susan M. Reichert. (Bleichner, Bryan) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Netgain Technology, LLC. (MKB) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Netgain Technology, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8786476) filed by Susan M. Reichert. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bleichner, Bryan) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-1300 (SRN/LIB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 6/17/2021 and Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 6/21/2021.(MKB) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Justin C Walker for Susan M. Reichert; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Terence Coates for Susan M. Reichert. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/7/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Terence R. Coates. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8792392 filed by Susan M. Reichert. (Bleichner, Bryan) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin C. Walker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8792365 filed by Susan M. Reichert. (Bleichner, Bryan) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Terence R. Coates, Justin C. Walker as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Netgain Technology, LLC. (MKB) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1300 (ECT/LIB). (MKB) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Netgain Technology, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8786476) filed by Susan M. Reichert. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bleichner, Bryan) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Netgain Technology, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Charles Walker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne T Regan