This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2023 at 08:33:45 (UTC).

Regino v. Staley et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 Regino filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Staley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dennis M. Cota and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dennis M. Cota

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aurora Regino

Defendants

Caitlin Dalby

Rebecca Konkin

Tom Lando

Eileen Robinson

Matt Tennis

Kelly Staley

Intervenor Defendant

GSA Network

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harmeet Kaur Dhillon

Michael A Columbo

Eric A. Sell, PHV

Jeremiah Graham

Joshua Wallace Dixon, PHV

Matthew Michael Hoesly

Defendant Attorneys

Brian A. Duus

Jimmie E. Johnson, I

Louis Anthony Leone

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Ariana Rodriguez

Jennifer Ling Chou

Elizabeth O. Gill

Adam F. Shearer

Amanda Goad

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by GSA Network for proceedings held on 02-28-2023 before Judge Hon. John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Maryann Valenoti. (Shearer, Adam) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#34

(#34) OPPOSITION by Aurora Regino to #22 Motion to Intervene,. Attorney Graham, Jeremiah added. (Graham, Jeremiah) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

22 #5

Proposed Order

22 #4

Conditional Answer

22 #3

Declaration of Dr. Jack Turban

22 #2

Proposed Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction

22 #1

Declaration of Ginna Brelsford

#22

(#34) OPPOSITION by Aurora Regino to #22 Motion to Intervene,. Attorney Graham, Jeremiah added. (Graham, Jeremiah) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

18 #2

Memorandum

2 #1

Memorandum

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by GSA Network for proceedings held on 02-28-2023 before Judge Hon. John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Maryann Valenoti. (Shearer, Adam) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) OPPOSITION by Aurora Regino to #22 Motion to Intervene,. Attorney Graham, Jeremiah added. (Graham, Jeremiah) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTES (Text Only) for MOTION HEARING before Senior District Judge John A. Mendez held on 02/28/2023. Plaintiff's counsel, Eric Sell and Joshua Dixon, present. Defendants' counsel, Brian Duus, present. The court and counsel discussed the pending motion. Arguments heard. The court SUBMITTED Plaintiff's #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. A written order to issue. Court Reporter: M. Valenoti. (York, M) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 2/24/2023 GRANTING #28 Motion to Strike; ORDERING that the docket entries at ECF Nos. 22-2 and 22-3 be stricken from the record. (Michel, G.) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) OBJECTIONS by Defendants Caitlin Dalby, et al., to #27 Reply Evidence in support of Motion. (Johnson, Jimmie) Modified on 2/23/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 2/23/2023: Plaintiff's #28 Motion to Strike is noticed for hearing on a date not designated for the Court's civil law and motion calendar. Consequently, the hearing set for 4/4/2023 is VACATED and RESET for 3/28/2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Aurora Regino in re #27 Reply re Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Response)(Dhillon, Harmeet) Modified on 2/22/2023 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to STRIKE by Aurora Regino. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2023 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY by Aurora Regino in support of #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Declaration)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariana Rodriguez on behalf of GSA Network. Attorney Rodriguez, Ariana added. (Rodriguez, Ariana) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael A Columbo on behalf of Aurora Regino. Attorney Columbo, Michael A added. (Columbo, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 1/20/2023 GRANTING #7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joshua Wallace Dixon, to appear for Aurora Regino. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Reader, L) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 1/20/2023 GRANTING #6 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Eric A. Sell, to appear for Aurora Regino. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Reader, L) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Aurora Regino for attorney Joshua W. Dixon to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Hoesly, Matthew Michael added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10654321) (Hoesly, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Aurora Regino for attorney Eric A. Sell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10654067) (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 1/10/2023: On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #2 , is SET for 2/14/2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before District Judge John A. Mendez. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Caitlin Dalby, Staley Kelly, Rebecca Konkin, Tom Lando, Eileen Robinson, Matt Tennis* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Harmeet Kaur Dhillon* *Dhillon Law Group, Inc.* *177 Post Street, Suite 700* *San Francisco, CA 94108*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Aurora Regino. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Aurora Regino. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10632361) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less