This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/09/2021 at 11:24:41 (UTC).

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA v. FIET ELECTRIC COMPANY INC et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA filed an Other lawsuit against FIET ELECTRIC COMPANY INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-00126

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Respondents

CONSUMER LIGHTING (U.S.) LLC

FIET ELECTRIC COMPANY INC

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC

SATCO PRODUCTS INC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

IKEA OF SWEDEN AB

IKEA U.S. RETAIL LLC

SAVANT SYSTEMS INC

IKEA SUPPLY AG

HOME DEPOT PRODUCT AUTHORITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brian James Whittaker

 

Court Documents

6 #15

Exhibit

6 #14

Exhibit

6 #13

Exhibit

6 #12

Exhibit

6 #11

Exhibit

6 #10

Exhibit

6 #9

Exhibit

6 #8

Exhibit

6 #7

Exhibit

6 #6

Exhibit

6 #5

Exhibit

6 #4

Exhibit

6 #3

Exhibit

6 #2

Exhibit

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) ORDER granting Request #1 for Issuance of Letters of Request. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit) (zcal) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) STATUS REPORT Regarding Unopposed Motion and Related ITC Investigation by REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Whittaker, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting Request #1 for Issuance of Letters of Request. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit) (zcal) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT Regarding Unopposed Motion and Related ITC Investigation by REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Whittaker, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 49.00, receipt number: 4616104729. (ztd) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case randomly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge John D. Bates is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. Case related to Case No. 20mc122. (ztd) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST from Respondents filed by REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA.(ztd) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less