This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2021 at 12:16:58 (UTC).

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA v. FIET ELECTRIC COMPANY INC et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA filed an Other lawsuit against FIET ELECTRIC COMPANY INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is John D. Bates. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-00122

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John D. Bates

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Respondents

FIET ELECTRIC COMPANY INC

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC

IKEA OF SWEDEN AB

IKEA U.S. RETAIL LLC

IKEA SUPPLY AG

HOME DEPOT PRODUCT AUTHORITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brian James Whittaker

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Letter of Request

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 motion for issuance of letter of request pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 and ordering Clerk's office to issue attached letter. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/9/20. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Request) (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

1 #4

Text of Proposed Order

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Memorandum in Support

#1

(#1) REQUEST from Petitioner filed by REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 49.00, receipt number: 4616104774. (eg) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketLetters Rogatory Issued. (tb) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 motion for issuance of letter of request pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 and ordering Clerk's office to issue attached letter. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/9/20. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Request) (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST from Petitioner filed by REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less