This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:18:32 (UTC).

Regenexx, LLC v. Regenx Health LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 Regenexx, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Regenx Health LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen B. Jackson, Jr and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00119

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

Presiding Judge

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regenexx, LLC

Defendants

Marshall Stein M.D.

Regenx Health LLC

Regenx Health Labs LLC

Marshall Stein

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Dee

Attorney at BROWN WINICK LAW FIRM

666 Grand Avenue, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant Attorneys

Peter C Riley

Attorney at TOM RILEY LAW FIRM PLC

4040 First Ave Ne, Po Box 998

Cedar Rapids, IA 52406-0998

Karen Bryant Tripp

Attorney at KAREN B. TRIPP, ATTORNEY AT LAW

4265 San Felipe, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) TEXT ORDER granting #22 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Submitting Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. The deadline for the parties to file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan under L.R. 16 shall be extended until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/19/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#22

(#22) Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling and Discovery Plan by Regenexx, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/3/2019. (Dee, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

21 #4

Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Lawsuit

21 #3

Affidavit Second Declaration of Defendant Marshall Stein, M.D.

21 #2

Affidavit Verification of Table in Exhibit

21 #1

Exhibit Table of Regen-Based Marks

#21

(#21) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Transfer Case out of Southern District of Iowa filed by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. Replies due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Regen-Based Marks, #2 Affidavit Verification of Table in Exhibit, #3 Affidavit Second Declaration of Defendant Marshall Stein, M.D., #4 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Lawsuit)(Tripp, Karen) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Transfer Case out of Southern District of Iowa by Regenexx, LLC. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Dee, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#13

(#14) DECLARATION of Marshall Stein M.D. re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

2 #3

Exhibit 9

2 #2

Exhibit 8

2 #1

Exhibit 7

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) Errata Exhibit 6 re #1 Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint, filed by Regenexx, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9)(Dee, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) TEXT ORDER granting #22 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Submitting Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. The deadline for the parties to file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan under L.R. 16 shall be extended until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/19/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling and Discovery Plan by Regenexx, LLC.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 7/3/2019. (Dee, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #19 MOTION to Transfer Case out of Southern District of Iowa filed by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. Replies due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Regen-Based Marks, #2 Affidavit Verification of Table in Exhibit, #3 Affidavit Second Declaration of Defendant Marshall Stein, M.D., #4 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Lawsuit)(Tripp, Karen) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Regenexx, LLC. Replies due by 6/10/2019.(Dee, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Transfer Case out of Southern District of Iowa by Regenexx, LLC. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Dee, Michael) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Karen B. Tripp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 5/21/2019. (slg) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3824236 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STATEMENT Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. (Riley, Peter) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DECLARATION of Marshall Stein M.D. re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Regenx Health LLC, Regenx Health Labs LLC, Marshall Stein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Riley, Peter) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regenexx, LLC. Regenx Health LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Dee, Michael) Modified on 5/13/2019 correction of served date 4/29/2019 and answer due date 5/20/2019. (kjw). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regenexx, LLC. Marshall Stein served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Dee, Michael) Modified on 5/13/2019 correction of served date 4/29/2019 and answer due date 5/20/2019. (kjw). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regenexx, LLC. Regenx Health Labs LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Dee, Michael) Modified on 5/13/2019, correction of served date 4/29/2019 and answer due date 5/20/2019. (kjw). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Regenexx, LLC. (Dee, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Regenexx, LLC. (Dee, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Regenexx, LLC. (Dee, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) See Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (kmc) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 7.1 Packet) (kmc) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Errata Exhibit 6 re #1 Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint, filed by Regenexx, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9)(Dee, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3795121., filed by Regenexx, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/15/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Dee, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.