This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:45:31 (UTC).

Regan v. Prudential Insurance Company Of America

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Regan filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Prudential Insurance Company Of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard M Gergel and Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03402

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Richard M Gergel

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael G Regan

Defendant

Prudential Insurance Company Of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathaniel W Bax

Attorney at Foster Law Firm

Po Box 2123

Greenville, SC 29602

Defendant Attorney

James Derrick Quattlebaum

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd

Po Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Prudential Insurance Company Of America answer due 1/23/2020. (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael G Regan.(sshe, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company Of America. Response to Motion due by 1/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

5 #1

Green card and DOI Letter

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company Of America. (sshe, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company Of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8812778.), filed by Michael G Regan. Service due by 3/5/2020(sshe, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael G Regan. Prudential Insurance Company Of America served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Bax, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company Of America. Response to Motion due by 1/27/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Prudential Insurance Company Of America answer due 1/23/2020. (Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael G Regan. Prudential Insurance Company Of America served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Bax, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company Of America. (sshe, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michael G Regan.(sshe, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company Of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8812778.), filed by Michael G Regan. Service due by 3/5/2020(sshe, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.