Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2020 at 11:07:24 (UTC).

Refresco Beverages US Inc. et al v. Symrise, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 Refresco Beverages US Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Symrise, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Ray, II and Christopher C. Bly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03058

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Refresco Beverages LLC

Refresco Beverages US Inc.

Petitioners

Dana Klaybor

Khanh Ly

Jason Pontes

Kaleena Gee

Califormulations, LLC

Tyrone Polhamus

Edmund O'Keeffe

Wanda Jackson

Defendant

Symrise, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey D. Mokotoff

Attorney at Ford & Harrison LLP-ATL

Suite 1900, 271 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Petitioner Attorneys

Kevin Harrison Hudson

Attorney at Hudson Lambert Parrott Walker, LLC

3575 Piedmont Road, Ste Bldg. 15, Suite 850

Atlanta, GA 30305

William Charles Hayes

Attorney at Hudson Parrott Walker, LLC

Fifteen Piedmont Center, Suite 850, 3575 Piedmont Road, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30305

Dawn N. Pettigrew

Attorney at Hudson Lambert Parrott Walker LLC

3575 Piedmont Road, Suite 850

Atlanta, GA 30305

Mary Lillian Walker

Attorney at Hudson Lambert Parrott Walker, LLC

15 Piedmont Center, 3575 Piedmont Road Ne, Suite 850

Atlanta, GA 30305

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kaleena Gee, Wanda Jackson, Dana Klaybor, Khanh Ly, Edmund O'Keeffe, Tyrone Polhamus, Jason Pontes. (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Califormulations, LLC, Kaleena Gee, Wanda Jackson, Dana Klaybor, Khanh Ly, Edmund O'Keeffe, Tyrone Polhamus, Jason Pontes (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#12

(#12) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Refresco Beverages LLC, Refresco Beverages US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason C. Kravitz with Exhibits)(Mokotoff, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

9 #5

Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration - Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissa

9 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Brief - Mary Lillian Walker's 2nd Declaration

9 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Brief - Complaint

9 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Brief - Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice

9 #1

Brief Supoenaed Non-Parties' Brief in Support of Motion for Sanctions

1 #10

1St Amended Complaint-I -6/8/20

1 #8

Ex -G - Subpoena to D. Klaybor

1 #7

Ex -F -Subpoena to K. Gee

1 #6

Ex -E -Subpoena to J. Pontes

1 #5

Ex -D -Subpoena to K. Ly

1 #4

Ex -C -Subpoena to T. Polhamus

1 #3

Ex -B -Subpoena to E. O'Keeffe

1 #2

Ex -A -Subpoena to W. Jackson

1 #1

Brief

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly terminated from case. (ah) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #14 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (ah) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kaleena Gee, Wanda Jackson, Dana Klaybor, Khanh Ly, Edmund O'Keeffe, Tyrone Polhamus, Jason Pontes. (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Califormulations, LLC, Kaleena Gee, Wanda Jackson, Dana Klaybor, Khanh Ly, Edmund O'Keeffe, Tyrone Polhamus, Jason Pontes (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Refresco Beverages LLC, Refresco Beverages US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason C. Kravitz with Exhibits)(Mokotoff, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WITHDRAWAL re #4 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery as Moot by Refresco Beverages LLC, Refresco Beverages US Inc. (Mokotoff, Jeffrey) Modified to edit text on 8/21/2020 (ah). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #4 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (ah) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Sanctions with Brief In Support by Califormulations, LLC, Kaleena Gee, Wanda Jackson, Dana Klaybor, Khanh Ly, Edmund O'Keeffe, Tyrone Polhamus, Jason Pontes. (Attachments: #1 Brief Supoenaed Non-Parties' Brief in Support of Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Brief - Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Brief - Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Brief - Mary Lillian Walker's 2nd Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration - Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(Walker, Mary) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WITHDRAWAL of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by Califormulations, LLC, Kaleena Gee, Wanda Jackson, Dana Klaybor, Khanh Ly, Edmund O'Keeffe, Tyrone Polhamus, Jason Pontes (Walker, Mary) Modified to edit text on 8/12/2020 (ah). (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY BRIEF re #4 Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery , #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Califormulations, LLC, Kaleena Gee, Wanda Jackson, Dana Klaybor, Khanh Ly, Edmund O'Keeffe, Tyrone Polhamus, Jason Pontes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mary Lillian Walker - Exhibit A to Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration - 2020.07.08 Refresco 6.4 Ltr to MLW, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration - 2020.07.21 MLW ltr to Mokotoff in Response to 6.4 Ltr, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration - 2020.07.06 Email to Kravitz, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration - Objection to Refresco Definition, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration - 2020.04.10 Refresco Follow-Up Ltr)(Walker, Mary) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCase reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:20-mi-67. (dmb) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Refresco Beverages LLC, Refresco Beverages US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason C. Kravitz)(Originally contained in #4 Cross Motion to Compel)(adg) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Cross MOTION to Compel Discovery with Brief In Support by Refresco Beverages LLC, Refresco Beverages US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Jason C. Kravitz, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mokotoff, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Califormulations, LLC, Kaleena Gee, Wanda Jackson, Dana Klaybor, Khanh Ly, Edmund O'Keeffe, Tyrone Polhamus, Jason Pontes re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas (Walker, Mary) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid: $ 47.00, receipt number AGANDC-9883349 (eop) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Quash Subpoenas with Brief In Support by Califormulations, LLC, Kaleena Gee, Wanda Jackson, Dana Klaybor, Khanh Ly, Edmund O'Keeffe, Tyrone Polhamus and Jason Pontes. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Ex -A -Subpoena to W. Jackson, #3 Ex -B -Subpoena to E. O'Keeffe, #4 Ex -C -Subpoena to T. Polhamus, #5 Ex -D -Subpoena to K. Ly, #6 Ex -E -Subpoena to J. Pontes, #7 Ex -F -Subpoena to K. Gee, #8 Ex -G - Subpoena to D. Klaybor, #9 Ex -H -Subpoena to Califormulations, #10 1St Amended Complaint-I -6/8/20, #11 Ex -J -5/9/19 Amended Complaint, #12 Ex -K -4/17/20 Order Special Master, #13 Ex -L -5/30/19 Pls' 1st RPDs to Dfts, #14 Ex -M -2/10/20 Pls' 2nd RPDs to Dfts, #15 Ex -N -4/30/20 Pls' 3rd RPDs to Dfts, #16 Declaration of Kevin Hudson)(eop) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less