This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/26/2020 at 07:43:25 (UTC).

Refined Technologies, Inc. v. United Laboratories International, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Refined Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against United Laboratories International, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04676

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Refined Technologies, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

UNITED LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Russell T Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Domingo Manuel LLagostera

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Kristian Rose

Attorney at Refined Technologies

480 Wildwood Forest Dr, Ste 500

Spring, TX 77380

Munira Jesani

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Ave, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Eric Michael Adams

Attorney at Tumey L.L.P.

5177 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1188

Houston, TX 77056

Matthew Scott Veech

Attorney at BoyarMiller

One Grove Street, 2925 Richmond Avenue, 14Th Floor

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

17 #6

Proposed Order

17 #5

Exhibit E

17 #4

Exhibit D

17 #3

Exhibit C

17 #2

Exhibit B

17 #1

Exhibit A

#17

(#17) MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by United Laboratories International, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Veech, Matthew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Refined Technologies, Inc. by United Laboratories International, LLC, filed.(Veech, Matthew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#15

(#15) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to United Laboratories International, LLC served on 12/6/2019, answer due 1/10/2020, filed.(LLagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time Deft. Responses due by 1/10/2019..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United Laboratories International, LLC, filed.(Adams, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Adams on behalf of United Laboratories International, LLC, filed. (Adams, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant's Response Date to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by United Laboratories International, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Veech, Matthew) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Refined Technologies, Inc., filed.(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet JS-44

1 #1

Exhibit A_Patent-US9017488

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23660959) filed by Refined Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Patent-US9017488, #2 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44)(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by United Laboratories International, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Veech, Matthew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Refined Technologies, Inc. by United Laboratories International, LLC, filed.(Veech, Matthew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to United Laboratories International, LLC served on 12/6/2019, answer due 1/10/2020, filed.(LLagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • ***Answer due for United Laboratories International, LLC by 1/10/2020. (arrivera, 4) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time Deft. Responses due by 1/10/2019..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United Laboratories International, LLC, filed.(Adams, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Adams on behalf of United Laboratories International, LLC, filed. (Adams, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant's Response Date to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by United Laboratories International, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Veech, Matthew) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Refined Technologies, Inc., filed.(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Kristian Rose to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Kristian Rose to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Refined Technologies, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (Wong, Russell) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (RuthGuerreroadi, 4) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to UNITED LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MUNIRA A. JESANI on behalf of Refined Technologies, Inc., filed. (Wong, Russell) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by DOMINGO M. LLAGOSTERA on behalf of Refined Technologies, Inc., filed. (Wong, Russell) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to UNITED LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL, LLC, filed.(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED LABORATORIES INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23660959) filed by Refined Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Patent-US9017488, #2 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44)(Wong, Russell) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin Rose

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell T. Wong

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Domingo Manuel Llagostera

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Munira A. Jesani