This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2021 at 05:47:22 (UTC).

Reeves v. Niantic, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 Reeves filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Niantic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05883

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jarrett Reeves

Defendant

Niantic, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

L. Timothy Fisher

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Alec Mitchell Leslie

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Philip Lawrence Fraietta

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Gutkin

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4004

Michael Graham Rhodes

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4004

Cameron James Clark

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4004

Kristine Anne Forderer

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4004

Rebecca Ferrari

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

#2

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT NIANTIC, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Niantic's deadline to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to October 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 20, 2021. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Niantic, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by Niantic, Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2021) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Certificate of Interested Entities by Niantic, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Nintendo Co. Ltd., Other Affiliate Google Inc., Other Affiliate The Pokemon Company, Other Affiliate The Pokemon Company International for Niantic, Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2021) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Niantic, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Nintendo Co. LTD., Other Affiliate Google Inc. for Niantic, Inc.. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2021) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Ferrari for Defendant, Niantic, Inc. (Ferrari, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/19/2021) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron James Clark for Defendant, Niantic, Inc. (Clark, Cameron) (Filed on 8/19/2021) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine Anne Forderer for Defendant, Niantic, Inc. (Forderer, Kristine) (Filed on 8/19/2021) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Gutkin for Defendant, Niantic, Inc. (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2021) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes for Defendant, Niantic, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2021) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/5/2021. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/4/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jarrett Reeves. Niantic, Inc. served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 8/3/2021) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Niantic, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jarrett Reeves.. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Niantic, Inc., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-16236082). Filed by Jarrett Reeves. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, L.) (Filed on 7/30/2021) Modified on 8/2/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Niantic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristine A Forderer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron James Clark

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey M. Gutkin