Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 09:29:03 (UTC).

Reeves v. Delaware North Companies, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Reeves filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Delaware North Companies, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. and William M. Skretny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01333

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.

Presiding Judge

William M. Skretny

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kayla Reeves

Respondents

Delaware North Companies, Incorporated doing business as d/b/a Top of the Falls Gift Shop and Top of the Falls Restaurant and Delaware North Companies Parks & Resorts, Inc d/b/a Top of the Falls Gift Shop and Top of the Falls Restaurant

Delaware North Companies, Incorporated doing business as Top of the Falls Gift Shop and Top of the Falls Restaurant and Delaware North Companies Parks & Resorts, Inc d/b/a Top of the Falls Gift Shop and Top of the Falls Restaurant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert J. Maranto, Jr.

Attorney at Andrews, Bernstein Maranto & Nicotra, PLLC

420 Franklin Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

Kaitlin E. Hastings

420 Franklin Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

Respondent Attorney

Christopher E. Buckey

Attorney at Cullen and Dykman LLP

80 State Street, Suite 900

Albany, NY 12207

 

Court Documents

7 #5

Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion

7 #4

Exhibit Notice of Removal and Petition for Removal

7 #3

Exhibit Affidavits of Service

7 #2

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

7 #1

Affidavit Attorney Affirmation

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand by Kayla Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affirmation, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavits of Service, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal and Petition for Removal, #5 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion)(Maranto, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

6 #3

Consent Form

6 #2

Consent Memorandum

6 #1

Case Management Order Form

#6

(#6) ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 9/24/20. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

4 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Delaware North Companies, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Buckey, Christopher) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delaware North Companies, Incorporated from Supreme Erie, case number 809226/2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3980945), filed by Delaware North Companies, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Buckey, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER -- Defendant failed to respond to Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand by November 2, 2020, as directed in this Court's 8 scheduling notice. Defendant must now respond to Plaintiff's #7 motion by November 16, 2020, or the motion will be considered unopposed. Plaintiff may file any reply by November 23, 2020. This Court will schedule oral argument, if necessary, by separate order. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 11/10/2020. (JCM) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIRMATION re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Kayla Reeves . (Maranto, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING NOTICE on #7 Motion to Remand. Response due by 11/2/2020. Reply due by 11/16/2020. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court, if necessary. (JCM) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand by Kayla Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affirmation, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavits of Service, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal and Petition for Removal, #5 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion)(Maranto, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 9/24/20. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT REFERRAL ORDER. Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 9/23/2020. (JCM) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: Action Required: Attorney is directed to file an index identifying State Court documents pursuant to local rule 81(A). (JD) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Delaware North Companies, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Buckey, Christopher) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Delaware North Companies, Incorporated. (Buckey, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delaware North Companies, Incorporated. (Buckey, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delaware North Companies, Incorporated from Supreme Erie, case number 809226/2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3980945), filed by Delaware North Companies, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Buckey, Christopher) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Edward Buckey