This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2020 at 08:31:06 (UTC).

Reeves v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Reeves filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is P. K. Holmes III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02046

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnny Reeves

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M Langevin

Attorney at McSweeney Langevin LLC

2116 2Nd Ave. S

Minneapolis, MN 55404

Rhett A McSweeney

Attorney at McSweeney Langevin LLC

2116 2Nd Ave. S

Minneapolis, MN 55404

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH

Suite 1700, 201 17Th Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30363

Graham C. Talley

Attorney at Mitchell William Selig Gates Woodyard PLLC

425 W. Capitol Street, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

Lindsay Macdonald

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A

777 S. Flagler Dr., Suite 300E

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Lyn Peeples Pruitt

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard

425 West Capitol Ave., Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201-3525

Andrea Shwayri Ferraro

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

777 S. Flagler Dr., Ste 300-East

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

*Restricted*

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#13

#14

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Macdonald on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Macdonald, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Shwayri Ferraro on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ferraro, Andrea) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. is withdrawn and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 6, 2020. (rab) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION of Richard North to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Graham C. Talley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Talley, Graham) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Peeples Pruitt on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: All Attorneys representing Parties in this case must be registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (hnc) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00023. Docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketREMARK: Case Transferred to the Western District of Arkansas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-23-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16365326 filed by Johnny Reeves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 4/1/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rhett A McSweeney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M Langevin