This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/17/2021 at 08:30:53 (UTC).

Reese v. United Petroleum Transports Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Reese filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against United Petroleum Transports Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey L. Cureton and Terry R Means. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00878

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeffrey L. Cureton

Presiding Judge

Terry R Means

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Y Reese

Duncanville, TX 75137

Defendants

United Petroleum Transports Inc

Bryain Bosch

Scott Lee

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

11 #1

Summons form-1

11 #2

Summons form-2

11 #3

Summons form-3

#12

#13

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to Bryain Bosch, Scott Lee, United Petroleum Transports Inc. (pef) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons filed by Lisa Y Reese. (pef) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AS MOOT and, ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE... It is therefore ORDERED that the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #5 ) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that this action should be returned to the United States District Judge for such other action as may be deemed appropriate. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 8/9/2021) (Attachments: #1 Summons form-1, #2 Summons form-2, #3 Summons form-3) (wxc) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#10) Exhibit #1- #6 filed by Lisa Y Reese (wxc) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Wed Jul 21 11:57:20 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (wxc) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNew case number 4:21-cv-0878 Reese v. United Petroleum Transports Inc et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:21-cv-01663. Future filings should be made in the FORT WORTH division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ajb) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Wed Jul 21 10:50:12 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/21/2021) (mcrd) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re: the plaintiff's unsigned #5 Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The plaintiff shall pay the required $402.00 filing fee to the Clerk of the Court within 14 days from the date of this order. If she fails to do so, denial of leave to proceed in forma pauperis will be recommended, and this case will be subject to dismissal without prejudice as provided by Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/21/2021) (mcrd) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Jul 20 10:21:14 CDT 2021 (crt) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lisa Y Reese (ykp) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lisa Y Reese. (ykp) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Bryain Bosch, Scott Lee, United Petroleum Transports Inc filed by Lisa Y Reese. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Petroleum Transports Inc. is a litigant