This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2020 at 09:39:28 (UTC).

REESE v. PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 REESE filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Jane Magnus-Stinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02610

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTOR REESE

Defendant

PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.

Aaron J. Williamson

Defendant Attorney

Danny Ray Dunbar

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting Parties' #15 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and to Arbitrate Plaintiff's Claims. The parties are ORDERED to file with the court a status report within 14 days of the arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/4/2020. (SWM) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Staying Proceedings

#16

(#16) Submission of Proposed Order To Stay Litigation and To Arbitrate Plaintiff's Claims Based Upon Stipulation, re #15 Joint MOTION To Stay Litigation and To Arbitrate Plaintiff's Claims Based Upon Stipulation, filed by Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Staying Proceedings)(Dunbar, Danny) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Stay

#15

(#15) Joint MOTION To Stay Litigation and To Arbitrate Plaintiff's Claims Based Upon Stipulation, filed by Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Stay)(Dunbar, Danny) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Danny Ray Dunbar on behalf of Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Dunbar, Danny) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER - Mr. Romack's Appearance is STRICKEN. Second, Mr. Dunbar has filed an Answer on behalf of Pucks, but has not entered an appearance in this case. Pucks' Answer, #8 , is STRICKEN for this reason. Third, Mr. Dunbar has filed three Motions to Dismiss, all of which appear to be identical except that the first Motion has no exhibits attached, the second Motion has one exhibit attached, and the third Motion has two exhibits attached. The Court STRIKES the first two Motions to Dismiss, [9;10], as they appear to have been inadvertently filed without both exhibits. Finally, the third Motion to Dismiss and attached exhibits are filed as scanned documents instead of as.pdf files directly from a word processing program, as required by Local Rule 5-1(c). Additionally, the third Motion to Dismiss was filed by Mr. Dunbar, who has not filed an appearance in this case. The third Motion to Dismiss, #11 , is STRICKEN due to these various issues. See Local Rule 1-3 ("The court may strike from the record any document that does not comply with the rules governing the form of documents filed with the court...."). Should Pucks wish to re-file the Motion to Dismiss, it must do so correctly, after carefully reviewing the Court's Local Rules and the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual. Links to both are found on the Court's website. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/6/2020. (JDH) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (But Stipulating to a Stay and an Order to Arbitrate Claims), filed by Plaintiff VICTOR REESE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order Order to Dismiss

11 #1

Supplement Exhibit A - Agreement to Arbitrate

#11

(#11) ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER ON 11/6/2020*** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Exhibit A - Agreement to Arbitrate, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order to Dismiss)(Dunbar, Danny) Modified on 11/6/2020 (JDH). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss

#10

(#10) ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER ON 11/6/2020*** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss)(Dunbar, Danny) Modified on 11/6/2020 (JDH). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#9

(#9) ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER ON 11/6/2020*** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Dunbar, Danny) Modified on 11/6/2020 (JDH). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#8

(#8) ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER ON 11/6/2020*** Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC.(Dunbar, Danny) Modified on 11/6/2020 (JDH). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC, filed by VICTOR REESE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6218322) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting Parties' #15 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and to Arbitrate Plaintiff's Claims. The parties are ORDERED to file with the court a status report within 14 days of the arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/4/2020. (SWM) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Submission of Proposed Order To Stay Litigation and To Arbitrate Plaintiff's Claims Based Upon Stipulation, re #15 Joint MOTION To Stay Litigation and To Arbitrate Plaintiff's Claims Based Upon Stipulation, filed by Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Staying Proceedings)(Dunbar, Danny) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint MOTION To Stay Litigation and To Arbitrate Plaintiff's Claims Based Upon Stipulation, filed by Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Stay)(Dunbar, Danny) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Danny Ray Dunbar on behalf of Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Dunbar, Danny) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER - Mr. Romack's Appearance is STRICKEN. Second, Mr. Dunbar has filed an Answer on behalf of Pucks, but has not entered an appearance in this case. Pucks' Answer, #8 , is STRICKEN for this reason. Third, Mr. Dunbar has filed three Motions to Dismiss, all of which appear to be identical except that the first Motion has no exhibits attached, the second Motion has one exhibit attached, and the third Motion has two exhibits attached. The Court STRIKES the first two Motions to Dismiss, [9;10], as they appear to have been inadvertently filed without both exhibits. Finally, the third Motion to Dismiss and attached exhibits are filed as scanned documents instead of as.pdf files directly from a word processing program, as required by Local Rule 5-1(c). Additionally, the third Motion to Dismiss was filed by Mr. Dunbar, who has not filed an appearance in this case. The third Motion to Dismiss, #11 , is STRICKEN due to these various issues. See Local Rule 1-3 ("The court may strike from the record any document that does not comply with the rules governing the form of documents filed with the court...."). Should Pucks wish to re-file the Motion to Dismiss, it must do so correctly, after carefully reviewing the Court's Local Rules and the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual. Links to both are found on the Court's website. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/6/2020. (JDH) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (But Stipulating to a Stay and an Order to Arbitrate Claims), filed by Plaintiff VICTOR REESE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER ON 11/6/2020*** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Exhibit A - Agreement to Arbitrate, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order to Dismiss)(Dunbar, Danny) Modified on 11/6/2020 (JDH). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER ON 11/6/2020*** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss)(Dunbar, Danny) Modified on 11/6/2020 (JDH). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER ON 11/6/2020*** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Dunbar, Danny) Modified on 11/6/2020 (JDH). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER ON 11/6/2020*** Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC.(Dunbar, Danny) Modified on 11/6/2020 (JDH). (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***STRICKEN PER #13 ORDER ON 11/6/2020*** NOTICE of Appearance by Danny Ray Dunbar on behalf of Defendant PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (Dunbar, Danny) Modified on 11/6/2020 (JDH). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Williamson on behalf of Plaintiff VICTOR REESE. (Williamson, Aaron) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC. (AKH) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff VICTOR REESE. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PUCKS EXPRESS, LLC, filed by VICTOR REESE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6218322) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less