This case was last updated from PACER on 04/28/2019 at 07:19:40 (UTC).

Reese v. Lucas County Job and Family Services

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 Reese filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Lucas County Job and Family Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Zouhary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00438

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leevorne Reese

Toledo, OH 43609

Defendant

Lucas County Job and Family Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

John A. Borell, Sr.

Attorney at Office of the Prosecuting Attorney - Lucas County - Adams

700 Adams Street

Toledo, OH 43604

Elaine Berendsen Szuch

Attorney at Office of the Prosecuting Attorney - Lucas County

711 Adams Street

Toledo, OH 43604

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Order, this action is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. This Court certifies that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/24/2019. (D,L) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#8

(#8) Order Dismissing Complaint. This action is dismissed, and this Court certifies that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/24/2019. (D,L) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

7 #2

*Restricted*

7 #1

Exhibit A-C: Judgment Entries, Lucas County Common Pleas Court

#7

(#7) Addendum to #1 Complaint, #4 Supplement filed by Leevorne Reese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, redacted: Judgment Entries, Lucas County Common Pleas Court, #2 Reference list)(R,Ke) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#6

(#6) Motion for extension of time until April 18, 2019 to answer filed by Defendant Lucas County Job and Family Services. (Borell, John) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Lucas County Job and Family Services on 3/1/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Leevorne Reese. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (M,L) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

4 #1

Exhibits A-C: Judgment Entries, Lucas County Common Pleas Court

#4

(#4) Addendum to #1 Complaint, filed by Leevorne Reese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C: Judgment Entries, Lucas County Common Pleas Court)(M,L) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/27/2019. (M,L) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#2

(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to pro se Plaintiff for service upon Lucas County Job and Family Services. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

1 #3

Complaint-file stamped

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of #8 & #9 mailed to Leevorne Reese at 2114 Airport Highway, Toledo, OH 43609 on 4/24/2019. (D,L) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Order, this action is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. This Court certifies that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/24/2019. (D,L) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order Dismissing Complaint. This action is dismissed, and this Court certifies that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Judge Jack Zouhary on 4/24/2019. (D,L) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Addendum to #1 Complaint, #4 Supplement filed by Leevorne Reese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, redacted: Judgment Entries, Lucas County Common Pleas Court, #2 Reference list)(R,Ke) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for extension of time until April 18, 2019 to answer filed by Defendant Lucas County Job and Family Services. (Borell, John) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Lucas County Job and Family Services on 3/1/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Leevorne Reese. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (M,L) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Addendum to #1 Complaint, filed by Leevorne Reese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C: Judgment Entries, Lucas County Common Pleas Court)(M,L) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of #3 Civil Case Management Procedures Order and Magistrate Consent Form mailed to Leevorene Reese at 2114 Airport Highway, Toledo, OH 43609 on 2/27/2019. Related document(s) #3 . (M,L) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 2/27/2019. (M,L) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to pro se Plaintiff for service upon Lucas County Job and Family Services. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,L) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Judge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (M,L) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint against Lucas County Job and Family Services. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 34660011215. Filed by Leevorne Reese. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (M,L) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2019: #3 Complaint-file stamped) (M,L). (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less