This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:35:26 (UTC).

REEDER v. Carnival Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 REEDER filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Carnival Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Lawrence King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-24367

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Lawrence King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natalie Reeder

Defendants

Carnival Cruise Line doing business as Carnival Cruise Line

Carnival Corporation doing business as Carnival Cruise Line

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Heyward Hickey

Attorney at Hickey Law Firm PA

1401 Brickell Avenue, Suite 510

Miami, FL 33131

Lisa Charli Goodman

Attorney at Hickey Law Firm

1401 Brickell Ave, Suite 510

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Scott P. Mebane

Attorney at Mase Mebane & Briggs, P.A.

2601 South Bayshore Drive, Suite 800

Miami, FL 33133

Curtis Jay Mase

Attorney at Mase Mebane & Briggs, P.A.

2601 South Bayshore Drive, Suite 800

Miami, FL 33133

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott P. Mebane on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Scott P. Mebane added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Mebane, Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curtis Jay Mase on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Curtis Jay Mase added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Mase, Curtis) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Natalie Reeder. Carnival Corporation waiver sent on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (Goodman, Lisa) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Carnival Cruise Line. (mee) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Charli Goodman on behalf of Natalie Reeder (Goodman, Lisa) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Carnival Corporation d/ba Carnival Cruise Line. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13748264, filed by NATALIE REEDER, as mother and natural Guardian of B.R., a minor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hickey, John) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott P. Mebane on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Scott P. Mebane added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Mebane, Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curtis Jay Mase on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Curtis Jay Mase added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Mase, Curtis) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Natalie Reeder. Carnival Corporation waiver sent on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (Goodman, Lisa) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Carnival Cruise Line. (mee) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Charli Goodman on behalf of Natalie Reeder (Goodman, Lisa) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Carnival Corporation d/ba Carnival Cruise Line. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13748264, filed by NATALIE REEDER, as mother and natural Guardian of B.R., a minor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hickey, John) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less