This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2021 at 09:25:55 (UTC).

Reed v. Owners Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Reed filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael E. Hegarty and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02594

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dale Reed

Laura Reed

Defendants

Owners Insurance Company

Adrianna Morales

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Seth Foster

Attorney at Foster Graham Milstein & Calisher, LLP

360 South Garfield Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80209

Defendant Attorneys

Hannah Seifert McCalla

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Hannah Rachel Seifert

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Cristina Noel Andrews

Attorney at Dagner Schluter Mitzner Werber LLC

8400 East Prentice Avenue, Suite 1401

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Deana R. Dagner

Attorney at Dagner Schluter Mitzner Werber LLC

8400 East Prentice Avenue, Suite 1401

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 18 November 2021. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#30

(#30) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 11/18/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#28

(#28) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (McCalla, Hannah) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#26

(#26) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 November 2021. Pursuant to the form declining consent under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) at ECF #24 , the Court directs the Clerk of Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#25

(#25) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 November 2021. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' and Defendant Adrianna Morales' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, made pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). ECF #23 . The Clerk of Court shall terminate Adrianna Morales as a party to this civil action. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#24

(#24) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (McCalla, Hannah) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

23 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

23 #23

Main Document

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Hannah Seifert McCalla (McCalla, Hannah) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

1 #16

State Court - Adrianna Morales Answer to Amended Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #15

State Court - Adrianna Morales Answer to Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #13

State Court - Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Ame

1 #11

State Court - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #8

State Court - Initial Procedure Order

1 #7

State Court - Amended Summons - Adrianna M. Morales

1 #2

State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #1

State Court - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Main Document

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 18 November 2021. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 11/18/2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#29) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/16/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (McCalla, Hannah) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CASE REASSIGNED. pursuant to #26 Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02594-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 November 2021. Pursuant to the form declining consent under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) at ECF #24 , the Court directs the Clerk of Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 November 2021. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' and Defendant Adrianna Morales' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, made pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). ECF #23 . The Clerk of Court shall terminate Adrianna Morales as a party to this civil action. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (McCalla, Hannah) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Adrianna Morales Only by Defendant Adrianna Morales. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dagner, Deana) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Hannah Seifert McCalla (McCalla, Hannah) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Adrianna Morales on 9/23/2021.(mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Adrianna Morales.(mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint and jury demand. By District Court Judge, Arapahoe County on 8/26/2021. (mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adrianna Morales, Owners Insurance Company, filed by Dale Reed, Laura Reed.(mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Amended Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand and Civil Cover Sheet upon Adrianna Morales on 8/18/2021 (mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand and Civil Cover Sheet upon Auto Owners Insurance Company on 08/13/2021 (mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Adrianna Morales, Owners Insurance Company, filed by Dale Reed, Laura Reed.(mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (mbrow, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2021cv31383. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8091125), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 State Court - Summons - Auto-Owners Insurance Company, #4 State Court - Summons - Adrianna M. Morales, #5 State Court - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #7 State Court - Amended Summons - Adrianna M. Morales, #8 State Court - Initial Procedure Order, #9 State Court - Return of Service - Auto-Owners Insurance Company, #10 State Court - Affidavit of Service - Adrianna Morales, #11 State Court - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #12 State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand, #13 State Court - Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #14 State Court - Waiver and Acceptance, #15 State Court - Adrianna Morales Answer to Complaint and Jury Demand, #16 State Court - Adrianna Morales Answer to Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannah R. Seifert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deana R. Dagner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Bennett Stephenson