This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2021 at 18:14:35 (UTC).

Reed v. Fortive Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Reed filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Fortive Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles J. Siragusa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-06312

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles J. Siragusa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hayley Reed

Defendants

Cepheid

Phenomenex, Inc.

Qualitrol Company LLC

Pall Corporation

Fortive Corporation

Andrew McCauley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael John Willemin

Defendant Attorneys

Vidya Atre Mirmira

Daniel J. Moore

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

6 #6

Supplement Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration

6 #5

Supplement Civil Principles Oath

6 #4

Supplement Attorney's Oath

6 #3

Supplement Sponsoring Affidavit

6 #2

Supplement Admission Petition Form

6 #1

Supplement Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affirmation of Attorney Mirmira

#6

#5

#4

1 #7

Summons to Andrew McCauley

1 #6

Summons to Pall Corporation

1 #4

Summons to Cepheid

1 #3

Summons to Qualitrol Company LLC

1 #2

Summons to Fortive Corporation

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORRECTED ORDER re #6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 6/8/21. (KAP) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Vidya Atre Mirmira. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 6/3/21. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- Modified on 6/3/2021 (JCL). (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Vidya Atre Mirmira ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4264664.) by Cepheid, Pall Corporation, Phenomenex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affirmation of Attorney Mirmira, #2 Supplement Admission Petition Form, #3 Supplement Sponsoring Affidavit, #4 Supplement Attorney's Oath, #5 Supplement Civil Principles Oath, #6 Supplement Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration)(Moore, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER, Answer due date updated as to Cepheid answer due 6/25/2021; Pall Corporation answer due 6/25/2021; Phenomenex, Inc. answer due 6/25/2021. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 5/24/21. (KAP) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: Document contains so ordered line and should be submitted via e-mail to the assigned judge. Refer to the Administrative Guide for e-mail addresses. No action required #4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Cepheid, Pall Corporation, Phenomenex, Inc.. (Moore, Daniel) (SG) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Cepheid, Pall Corporation, Phenomenex, Inc.. (Moore, Daniel) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Moore on behalf of Cepheid, Pall Corporation, Phenomenex, Inc. (Moore, Daniel) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Cepheid, Fortive Corporation, Andrew McCauley, Pall Corporation, Phenomenex, Inc., Qualitrol Company LLC. (SG) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cepheid, Fortive Corporation, Andrew McCauley, Pall Corporation, Phenomenex, Inc., Qualitrol Company LLC $ 402 receipt number 0209-4214566, filed by Hayley Reed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Fortive Corporation, #3 Summons to Qualitrol Company LLC, #4 Summons to Cepheid, #5 Summons to Phenomenex, Inc., #6 Summons to Pall Corporation, #7 Summons to Andrew McCauley)(Willemin, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less