This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2020 at 09:16:11 (UTC).

Reed v. Damir et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 Reed filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Damir. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Staci G Cornelius and Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00224

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Staci G Cornelius

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kia Nuelle Reed

Defendants

Muminovic Damir

MNM Transporation Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas M Roy, Jr

Attorney at THE ROY LAW FIRM LLC

2107 5Th Avenue North, Suite 201

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

James A Potts, II

Attorney at STOCKHAM, COOPER & POTTS, P.C.

1111 Financial Center, 505 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

John Thomas Salmon

Attorney at STOCKHAM, COOPER & POTTS, PC

505 20Th Street North, Ste. 111

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Certificate of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C Affidavit (AZ)

1 #2

Exhibit B Affidavit (Damir)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/7/2020. (YMB) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/4/2021. Dispositive motions due by 2/3/2021. Status Conference set for Monday, 1/11/2021 at 11:00 AM, CR 7B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. See Order for other deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/7/2020. (YMB) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES PENDING BEFORE JUDGE HAIKALA. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/24/20. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Potts, James) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Reed by Kia Nuelle Reed.(Roy, Douglas) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/11/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:20-cv-224-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. The status conference set for March 11, 2020 is CANCELLED. (MRR, ) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: A telephone status conference is currently set for 10:30 a.m. on March 11, 2020, (Doc. #4 ). The parties are REMINDED that the status conference will be cancelled by separate order if, prior to the date of the conference, all parties submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/10/2020. (MSN) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/24/20. (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 6, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after April 6, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on March 11, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/24/20. (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Muminovic Damir, MNM Transporation Services LLC. filed by Muminovic Damir, MNM Transporation Services LLC (Potts, James) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3539774 (B4601104206). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MNM Transporation Services LLC, Muminovic Damir from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2019-905483.,(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Affidavit (Damir), # 3 Exhibit C Affidavit (AZ), # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Certificate of Removal)(MRR, ). (Potts, James) Modified on 2/20/2020 (MRR, ). (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint by Muminovic Damir.-Deemed filed 2/5/20, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p.74 of 105).(MRR, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint by MNM Transporation Services LLC.- Deemed filed 1/30/20, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p. 36 of 105)(MRR, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT against Muminovic Damir, MNM Transporation Services LLC, filed by Kia Nuelle Reed.- Deemed filed 12/18/19, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p.11 of 105)(MRR, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MNM Transporation Services LLC, Muminovic Damir from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2019-905483., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit (Damir), #3 Exhibit C Affidavit (AZ), #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Removal)(MRR, ) Modified text on 2/20/2020 (MRR, ). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas M Roy, Jr