This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2022 at 07:57:43 (UTC).

Reed v. Chamblee et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 Reed filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Chamblee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy J. Corrigan and Patricia D. Barksdale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01059

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Nathaniel Reed

Defendants

Brandel Eugene Chamblee

Damon Hack

Benjamin Shane Bacon

Eamon Lynch

Golfweek

Gannett Co., Inc.

TGC, LLC doing business as Golf Channel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Larry Elliot Klayman

Defendant Attorneys

Deanna Kendall Shullman

Minch Minchin

Rachel E. Fugate

Carol J. Locicero

Linda Riedemann Norbut

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ORDER dismissing #1 Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than 12/16/2022 and Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint no later than 1/13/2023. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/18/2022. (CKM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

26 #1

Exhibit

26 #26

Main Document

#25

(#25) DECLARATION of Andrew Eitingon re #14 Order by TGC, LLC. (Minchin, Minch) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#24

(#24) SUPPLEMENT and RESPONSE to #14 Order filed by Patrick Nathaniel Reed. (Klayman, Larry) Modified text on 10/25/2022 (BD). (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Patrick Nathaniel Reed. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Eamon Lynch. (Minchin, Minch) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#15

(#23) ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendants' #8 Unopposed Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and #15 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants need not respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint until further order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 10/21/2022. (CKM) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#14

(#24) SUPPLEMENT and RESPONSE to #14 Order filed by Patrick Nathaniel Reed. (Klayman, Larry) Modified text on 10/25/2022 (BD). (Entered: 10/25/2022)

1 #8

Proposed Summons

1 #7

Proposed Summons

1 #6

Proposed Summons

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER dismissing #1 Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than 12/16/2022 and Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint no later than 1/13/2023. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/18/2022. (CKM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Reassign and Transfer this Case as Related to Previously Filed Case by Patrick Nathaniel Reed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Klayman, Larry) Modified text on 11/3/2022 (BD). (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DECLARATION of Andrew Eitingon re #14 Order by TGC, LLC. (Minchin, Minch) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SUPPLEMENT and RESPONSE to #14 Order filed by Patrick Nathaniel Reed. (Klayman, Larry) Modified text on 10/25/2022 (BD). (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendants' #8 Unopposed Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and #15 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants need not respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint until further order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 10/21/2022. (CKM) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Patrick Nathaniel Reed. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Eamon Lynch. (Minchin, Minch) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Damon Hack. (Minchin, Minch) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Brandel Eugene Chamblee. (Minchin, Minch) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Benjamin Shane Bacon. (Minchin, Minch) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER of service returned executed on 10/14/2022 by Brandel Eugene Chamblee as to Brandel Eugene Chamblee. (Fugate, Rachel) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER of service returned executed on 10/14/2022 by Benjamin Shane Bacon as to Benjamin Shane Bacon. (Fugate, Rachel) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by TGC, LLC. (Minchin, Minch) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified text on 10/17/2022 (BD). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE and Partial Opposition to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint filed by Patrick Nathaniel Reed. (Klayman, Larry) Modified text on 10/14/2022 (BD). (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TGC, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation, Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Corporate Parent Comcast Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent NBCUniversal, LLC, Corporate Parent Comcast DW Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Enterprise, Inc., Corporate Parent SNL Entertainment Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast Snap Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent E! Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Comcast SportsNet NE Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Brandel Eugene Chamblee, Other Affiliate Damon Hack, Other Affiliate Benjamin Shane Bacon, Other Affiliate Eamon Lynch for TGC, LLC. (Minchin, Minch) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by TGC, LLC. (Minchin, Minch) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Benjamin Shane Bacon, Brandel Eugene Chamblee, Gannett Co., Inc., Golfweek, Damon Hack, Eamon Lynch, TGC, LLC. (BD) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:22-cv-1059-TJC-PDB. (NAS) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20043139) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less