This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2020 at 10:13:34 (UTC).

REED v. BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A. et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 REED filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against BRADLEY A FRIEDMAN, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-22973

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER REED

Defendants

BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A.

STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Michael Murado

2010 S.W. 99Th Avenue

Miramar, FL 33025

Defendant Attorney

Rafael Recalde

Attorney at Recalde Law Firm, P.A.

10800 Biscayne Blvd, Ste 988

Miami, FL 33161

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A., STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Recalde, Rafael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CHRISTOPHER REED. Replies due by 9/1/2020. (Murado, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A., STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.. Attorney Rafael Recalde added to party BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Rafael Recalde added to party STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Recalde, Rafael) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by CHRISTOPHER REED. BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A. served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Murado, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by CHRISTOPHER REED. STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC. served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Murado, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#49

(#5) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A., STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A., STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13205938, filed by CHRISTOPHER REED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Murado, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A., STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Recalde, Rafael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CHRISTOPHER REED. Replies due by 9/1/2020. (Murado, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A., STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.. Attorney Rafael Recalde added to party BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Rafael Recalde added to party STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Recalde, Rafael) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by CHRISTOPHER REED. BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A. served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020. (Murado, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by CHRISTOPHER REED. STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC. served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Murado, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mdc) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A., STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BRADLEY A. FRIEDMAN, P.A., STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13205938, filed by CHRISTOPHER REED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Murado, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAR LAKES ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Michael Murado