This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2020 at 09:41:23 (UTC).

REED v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 REED filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ALLEGHENY COUNTY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01577

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREW REED

Defendant

ALLEGHENY COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sammy Sugiura

Attorney at Cohen & Grace

Us Steel Tower, 600 Grant Street, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Ryan Carroll

Attorney at Edgar Snyder & Associates LLC

600 Grant Street 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by ANDREW REED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sugiura, Sammy) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Carroll on behalf of ANDREW REED. Attorney Sammy Sugiura terminated. (Carroll, Ryan) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 10/20/20. (jhi) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to ALLEGHENY COUNTY (ma) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6010277), filed by ANDREW REED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Sammy Sugiura for ANDREW REED. Attorney Ryan Carroll terminated. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/11/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cyk) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by ANDREW REED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sugiura, Sammy) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Carroll on behalf of ANDREW REED. Attorney Sammy Sugiura terminated. (Carroll, Ryan) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 10/20/20. (jhi) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to ALLEGHENY COUNTY (ma) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6010277), filed by ANDREW REED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLEGHENY COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Carroll

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sammy Y. Sugiura