This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2022 at 07:25:10 (UTC).

Reed v. AIDS Healthcare Foundation

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Reed filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AIDS Healthcare Foundation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03855

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarah Reed

Defendant

AIDS Healthcare Foundation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silvia Cristina Stanciu

Attorney at Phillips & Associates

45 Broadway, Suite 620

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AIDS Healthcare Foundation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26134852)Document filed by Sarah Reed..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AIDS Healthcare Foundation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sarah Reed..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AIDS Healthcare Foundation..(pc) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/3/2022) (jca) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#6

(#6) INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by September 9, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are required to notify the Court before the deadline for the above submissions by calling (212) 805-0292 and must e-mail a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination to the Orders and Judgments Clerk (judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov). (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/3/2022) (jca) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by September 9, 2022, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/3/2022) (jca) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. AIDS Healthcare Foundation served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch. Document filed by Sarah Reed..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. AIDS Healthcare Foundation served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch. Document filed by Sarah Reed..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by September 9, 2022, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/3/2022) (jca) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by September 9, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND THE COURT'S INDIVIDUAL PRACTICES TO ALL PARTIES. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are required to notify the Court before the deadline for the above submissions by calling (212) 805-0292 and must e-mail a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination to the Orders and Judgments Clerk (judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov). (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/3/2022) (jca) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/3/2022) (jca) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AIDS Healthcare Foundation..(pc) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AIDS Healthcare Foundation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sarah Reed..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AIDS Healthcare Foundation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26134852)Document filed by Sarah Reed..(Stanciu, Silvia) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIDS HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVIA CRISTINA STANCIU