This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2021 at 10:34:25 (UTC).

Reed et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Reed filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Tyson Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Jon A. York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01155

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Symantha Reed

Charles Goetz

James Spaulding

Gary Crawford

Wendy Wharton

Michelle Whitehead

Defendant

Tyson Foods, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Chancery Clerk Steve Walker

Dyersburg, TN 38024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert E. Barnes

Attorney at ROBERT BARNES

700 S. Flower St., Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Brennan Tyler Brooks

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF B. TYLER BROOKS, PLLC

P.O. Box 10767

Greensboro, NC 27404

Defendant Attorney

J. Gregory Grisham

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 312

Memphis, TN 38120

 

Court Documents

27 #1

Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Ame

#27

(#27) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Complaint by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Complaint)(Grisham, J.) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#26

(#26) ORDER GRANTING #24 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMIT FOR MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/24/21. (cdi) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#25

(#25) ORDER GRANTING #23 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Responses due by 12/9/2021. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/24/21. (cdi) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#24

(#24) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages proposed order submitted by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Grisham, J.) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Grisham, J.) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER DENYING #17 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/22/21. (cdi) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

17 #1

Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

#17

(#22) ORDER DENYING #17 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/22/21. (cdi) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

9 #3

Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Chancery Court Complaint

9 #2

Supplement - Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For This Court To Hear And Rule On

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Brennan Tyler Brooks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brooks, Brennan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

6 #1

Memorandum Ex Parte Application

#6

(#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Ex Parte Application For This Court To Hear And Rule On Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand (proposed order submitted) filed by Wendy Wharton, Charles Goetz, James Spaulding, Steve Walker, Michelle Whitehead, Gary Crawford, Symantha Reed has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: 1)You were granted filing privileges to the Western District of Tennessee for purposes of filing a Motion for Pro Hac Vice ONLY. Instead, you filed an Emergency Motion to Remand. As you have not been admitted to practice in the Western District of Tennessee, your Emergency Motion is being terminated without prejudice. If you need assistance with filing the Pro Hac Vice Motion, you may contact the Attorney Admissions Clerk whom your office spoke to yesterday. Pro Hac Vice Admission only allows you to file in this specific case and is subject to the $150 Pro Hac Vice fee per attorney per case. Any additional cases that you may have would require you to follow the same Pro Hac Vice Admission process in order to participate in that case. 2) Your document titled PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT contains what appears to be an ink signature. Signatures MUST COMPLY with amended LR 11.1. Please see our website for further information. 3) Your attachment titled PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR THIS COURT TO HEAR AND RULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT contains the application/memo, a declaration and exhibits as one continuous document. Each document should have been attached as separate documents and each described in the Description box (Ex. Application/Memorandum; Exhibit 1 to Application/Memo-Declaration of.....; Exhibit 2 to Application/Memo- Policy 1234; Exhibit 2 to Application/Memo- Letter from John Doe, etc... ). ***Please complete either the Full Bar Admission process or the Pro Hac Vice Admission process. After the Judge has granted your admission to this Court, you may re-file your motion to remand with the corrections listed above. ***Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (cdi) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#2

(#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Carl Imhof

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Elizabeth Chappelear

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Complaint by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Complaint)(Grisham, J.) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER GRANTING #24 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMIT FOR MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/24/21. (cdi) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER GRANTING #23 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Responses due by 12/9/2021. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/24/21. (cdi) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages proposed order submitted by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Grisham, J.) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Grisham, J.) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER DENYING #17 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/22/21. (cdi) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Affidavit Verification Reed, #6 Affidavit Verification Goetz, #7 Affidavit Verification Spaulding, #8 Affidavit Verification Crawford, #9 Affidavit Verification Wharton) (Barnes, Robert) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' #9 MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/3/2021. (mbm) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: IN PERSON Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2021 re #9 Emergency MOTION to Remand. Opening statements. Arguments by Parties. Responses by Parties. Closing statements. Court to issue Order. Present: Robert Barnes, Brennan Brooks (via phone) for Plaintiffs. Gregory Grisham for Defendant. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE as to Robert E. Barnes. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/29/21. (cdi) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/22/2021. (mbm) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Emergency MOTION to Remand , proposed order submitted, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement - Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For This Court To Hear And Rule On Plaintiffs Motion To Remand Action To State Court, #3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Chancery Court Complaint, #4 Affidavit - Declaration of Robert E. Barnes, Esq.)(Brooks, Brennan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Brennan Tyler Brooks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brooks, Brennan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Ex Parte Application For This Court To Hear And Rule On Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand (proposed order submitted) filed by Wendy Wharton, Charles Goetz, James Spaulding, Steve Walker, Michelle Whitehead, Gary Crawford, Symantha Reed has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: 1)You were granted filing privileges to the Western District of Tennessee for purposes of filing a Motion for Pro Hac Vice ONLY. Instead, you filed an Emergency Motion to Remand. As you have not been admitted to practice in the Western District of Tennessee, your Emergency Motion is being terminated without prejudice. If you need assistance with filing the Pro Hac Vice Motion, you may contact the Attorney Admissions Clerk whom your office spoke to yesterday. Pro Hac Vice Admission only allows you to file in this specific case and is subject to the $150 Pro Hac Vice fee per attorney per case. Any additional cases that you may have would require you to follow the same Pro Hac Vice Admission process in order to participate in that case. 2) Your document titled PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT contains what appears to be an ink signature. Signatures MUST COMPLY with amended LR 11.1. Please see our website for further information. 3) Your attachment titled PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR THIS COURT TO HEAR AND RULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT contains the application/memo, a declaration and exhibits as one continuous document. Each document should have been attached as separate documents and each described in the Description box (Ex. Application/Memorandum; Exhibit 1 to Application/Memo-Declaration of.....; Exhibit 2 to Application/Memo- Policy 1234; Exhibit 2 to Application/Memo- Letter from John Doe, etc... ). ***Please complete either the Full Bar Admission process or the Pro Hac Vice Admission process. After the Judge has granted your admission to this Court, you may re-file your motion to remand with the corrections listed above. ***Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (cdi) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court and Ex Parte Application For This Court To Hear And Rule On Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand (proposed order submitted) by Gary Crawford, Charles Goetz, Symantha Reed, James Spaulding, Steve Walker, Wendy Wharton, Michelle Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Ex Parte Application)(Barnes, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tyson Foods, Inc. from Chancery Court for Dyer County, case number 21-cv-512 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3726324), filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Elizabeth Chappelear, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Carl Imhof, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Grisham, J.) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tyson Foods, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Gregory Grisham