This case was last updated from PACER on 07/14/2019 at 07:54:48 (UTC).

Reece v. S8 Engineering, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Reece filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against S8 Engineering, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00054

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emily Reece

Defendants

Entegee, Inc.

S8 Engineering, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric E. Holm

Attorney at HOLM LAW FIRM, PLLC

115 N. Broadway, Suite 304, P.O. Box 3094

Billings, MT 59103

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Mary Varela

Attorney at CRIST, KROGH & NORD, PLLC

The Securities Building, 2708 First Avenue North, Suite 300

Billings, MT 59101

John G. Crist

Attorney at CRIST, KROGH & NORD, PLLC

The Securities Building, 2708 First Avenue North, Suite 300

Billings, MT 59101

Roger G. Trim

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. - DENVER

2000 South Colorado Boulevard, Tower Three, Suite 900

Denver, CO 80222

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDR) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#12

(#12) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#11

(#11) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/4/2019. (JDR) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#10

(#10) Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel John G. Crist, Elizabeth Mary Varela, Eric E. Holm, Roger G. TrimConsent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/20/2019. (JDR) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Entegee, Inc.. (Varela, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Entegee, Inc.. (Varela, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Mary Varela on behalf of Entegee, Inc. (Varela, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Crist on behalf of Entegee, Inc. (Crist, John) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by S8 Engineering, Inc.. (Trim, Roger) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Emily Reece, filed by S8 Engineering, Inc. (AEC) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

3 #1

State Court File

#3

(#3) STATE COURT FILE: DV-19-0428, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. Original file held in the clerk's office on the open civil case shelf. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (AEC) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by S8 Engineering, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tessenderlo Group, NV, Corporate Parent Tessenderlo Kerley, Inc., Corporate Parent Tessenderlo USA, Inc. (DE) for S8 Engineering, Inc... (Trim, Roger) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Declaration of Tom Moriarity

1 #3

Acknowledgment

1 #2

Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Acknowledge Service of Complaint

1 #1

State Court Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDR) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/4/2019. (JDR) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Electronic Mailing of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel John G. Crist, Elizabeth Mary Varela, Eric E. Holm, Roger G. TrimConsent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/20/2019. (JDR) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Entegee, Inc.. (Varela, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Entegee, Inc.. (Varela, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Mary Varela on behalf of Entegee, Inc. (Varela, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Crist on behalf of Entegee, Inc. (Crist, John) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by S8 Engineering, Inc.. (Trim, Roger) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Emily Reece, filed by S8 Engineering, Inc. (AEC) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE COURT FILE: DV-19-0428, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. Case Register Report and File Receipt. Original file held in the clerk's office on the open civil case shelf. (Attachments: #1 State Court File) (AEC) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by S8 Engineering, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tessenderlo Group, NV, Corporate Parent Tessenderlo Kerley, Inc., Corporate Parent Tessenderlo USA, Inc. (DE) for S8 Engineering, Inc... (Trim, Roger) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Filing fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2309785 (AMC) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (CASE NUMBER IS CV-19-54-BLG-SPW-TJC) by S8 Engineering, Inc. from Yellowstone County State Court, case number DV-19-0428 filed by S8 Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Acknowledge Service of Complaint, #3 Acknowledgment, #4 Declaration of Tom Moriarity, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less