This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:49:38 (UTC).

REECE et al v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by REECE against JOHNSON JOHNSON in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17168

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHANE REECE

THE ESTATE OF LATISHA BROCK

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SHANE REECE, THE ESTATE OF LATISHA BROCK re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (PALMER, MELANIE) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916667) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SHANE REECE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PALMER, MELANIE) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SHANE REECE, THE ESTATE OF LATISHA BROCK re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (PALMER, MELANIE) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Member Case Direct File on 8/26/2019, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jdb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916667) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SHANE REECE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PALMER, MELANIE) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.