This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2021 at 08:42:13 (UTC).

REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom) v. Hirshfeld

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED a limited company of the United Kingdom filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Hirshfeld. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01100

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom)

Defendant

Andrew Hirshfeld

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Zaccaria

Attorney at Notaro, Michalos & Zaccaria P.C. (NY-NA)

100 Dutch Hill Roadsuite 240

Orangeburg, NY 10962

Peter Bucci

Attorney at Notaro, Michalos & Zaccaria P.C. (NY-NA)

100 Dutch Hill Roadsuite 240

Orangeburg, NY 10962

Lucy Jewett Wheatley

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 East Canal St

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorney

Catherine M. Yang

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (Alexandria)

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

16 #4

Receipt

16 #3

Proposed Order

16 #2

Exhibit

16 #1

Affidavit

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Receipt)(Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine M. Yang on behalf of Andrew Hirshfeld (Yang, Catherine) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Fina. Interest Discl. Stmt, Complaint served on Attorney General of the U.S., U.S. Dept. of Justice on 10/19/2021, filed by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Notice, Fin. Int. Discl. Stmt, Civil Cover Sheet served on Felicia Taylor, Paralegal at office of the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern Dist. of Virginia, Office of General Counsel on 10/7/2021, filed by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

12 #1

Notice to Attorney

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Fina. Interest Discl. Stmt, Complaint served on Robert Walker on 10/01/2021, filed by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#10

(#10) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#9

(#9) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed John Zaccaria for REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/01/2021. (clar, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Peter Bucci for REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/01/2021. (clar, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#5

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Receipt)(Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine M. Yang on behalf of Andrew Hirshfeld (Yang, Catherine) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Fina. Interest Discl. Stmt, Complaint served on Attorney General of the U.S., U.S. Dept. of Justice on 10/19/2021, filed by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Notice, Fin. Int. Discl. Stmt, Civil Cover Sheet served on Felicia Taylor, Paralegal at office of the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern Dist. of Virginia, Office of General Counsel on 10/7/2021, filed by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Fina. Interest Discl. Stmt, Complaint served on Robert Walker on 10/01/2021, filed by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed John Zaccaria for REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/01/2021. (clar, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Peter Bucci for REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/01/2021. (clar, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Andrew Hirshfeld, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (choy, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Zaccaria and Certification of Local Counsel Lucy Jewett Wheatley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8024860. by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter Bucci and Certification of Local Counsel Lucy Jewett Wheatley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8024843. by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8024049.), filed by REEBOK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (a limited company of the United Kingdom). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wheatley, Lucy) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reebok International Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine M. Yang