This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2023 at 07:52:49 (UTC).

Redwood Technologies, LLC v. Askey Computer Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Redwood Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Askey Computer Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01279

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Redwood Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Askey Computer Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick J. Conroy

John Paul Murphy

Jonathan H. Rastegar

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Harbor Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent Monument IP Fund 2 for Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Paul Murphy on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC. Attorney John Paul Murphy added to party Redwood Technologies, LLC(pty:pla) (Murphy, John) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan H. Rastegar on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC. Attorney Jonathan H. Rastegar added to party Redwood Technologies, LLC(pty:pla) (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Askey Computer Corporation. (zv) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Redwood Technologies, LLC as to Askey Computer Corporation. Waiver sent on 1/19/2023, answer due 4/19/2023. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Redwood Technologies, LLC as to Askey Computer Corporation. Waiver sent on 1/19/2023, answer due 4/19/2023. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Askey Computer Corporation. (zv) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan H. Rastegar on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC. Attorney Jonathan H. Rastegar added to party Redwood Technologies, LLC(pty:pla) (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Paul Murphy on behalf of Redwood Technologies, LLC. Attorney John Paul Murphy added to party Redwood Technologies, LLC(pty:pla) (Murphy, John) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. Case assigned as there are pending related cases. (sm3) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Harbor Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent Monument IP Fund 2 for Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16869683). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Redwood Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conroy, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less