This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2019 at 07:31:57 (UTC).

Redwine v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 Redwine filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02349

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Redwine

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin Daniel Crump

Attorney at DAVIS AND CRUMP, P.C.

2601 14Th St.

Gulfport, MS 39501

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings (CLO) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT of Keith Redwine against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7398381, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Keith Redwine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service)(Crump, Martin) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

1 #3

Waiver of Service

1 #2

Original Filing Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings (CLO) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Keith Redwine to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • (#2) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued: 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (JWD) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT of Keith Redwine against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7398381, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Keith Redwine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service)(Crump, Martin) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.