This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2021 at 13:28:19 (UTC).

John Rede v. Plains Marketing, L.P., et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 John Rede filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Plains Marketing, L P . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00693

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Rede

Defendants

Plains All American Pipeline, L.P.

Plains Marketing, L.P.

WTL Oil, LLC

Spiro Penovic

Mammoth Energy Services, Inc.

Mammoth Energy Partners, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Thomas Bowers

Attorney at DeSouza Law, PC

3201 Cherry Ridge Street, Ste. C-300

San Antonio, TX 78230

Robert B. Evans, III

Attorney at Desouza Law PC

3201 Cherry Ridge, Suite C-300

San Antonio, TX 78216

Jason F. DeSouza

Attorney at DeSouza Law, PC

3201 Cherry Ridge Dr., Suite C-300

San Antonio, TX 78230

Jonathan Scott Frederick

Attorney at J.SCOTT FREDERICK, PLLC

850 Park Street, Suite 100

Beaumont, TX 77701

Defendant Attorneys

Erik L. Krudop

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith & Lee, PLLC

10001 Reunion Place, Ste. 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

David Louis Ortega

Attorney at Naman, Howell, Smith and Lee

10001 Reunion Place, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

Greg R. Hokenson

Attorney at Brock Guerra Srandmo Dimaline Jones, P.C.

17339 Redland Road

San Antonio, TX 78247

Amanda E. Carollo

Attorney at Brock Guerra Strandmo Dimaline Jones PC

17339 Redland Road

San Antonio, TX 78247

Mark Richard Strandmo

Attorney at Brock Guerra Strandmo Dimaline Jones PC

17339 Redland Road

San Antonio, TX 78247-2302

Nicholas J. Lanza

Attorney at Lanza Law Firm, PC

4950 Bissonnet Street

Houston, TX 77401

Robin B. Brzozowski

Attorney at Lanza Law Firm, P.C.

300 E. Sonterra Blvd., #1140

San Antonio, TX 78258

 

Court Documents

#59

#58

#57

#56

#55

#54

51 #2

Proposed Order

51 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#51

48 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#48

47 #2

Exhibit 4th Amd Complaint

47 #1

Memo in Support Memo in Support of Mtn for Leave

#47

#29

#10

8 #3

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

8 #2

Supplement Supreme Court of TX Letter

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Amended ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint by WTL Oil, LLC.(Carollo, Amanda) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint by Mammoth Energy Partners, LLC, Mammoth Energy Services, Inc..(Carollo, Amanda) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Plaintiff's Designation of Experts by Juan Rede. (DeSouza, Jason) Modified on 8/25/2021 (rg). (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mammoth Energy Partners, LLC, Mammoth Energy Services, Inc., Spiro Penovic, WTL Oil, LLC amending #10 Second Amended Complaint, #29 Third Amended Complaint, filed by Juan Rede.(rg) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #47 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend to file Fourth Amended Complaint is HEREBY GRANTED and the clerk is HEREBY ORDERED to file the Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint into the record entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) AMENDED ANSWER to #29 Third Amended Complaint by WTL Oil, LLC. (rg) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) PROPOSED ORDER to #47 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Juan Rede. (DeSouza, Jason) Modified on 8/11/2021 (rg). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #48 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. Motion was refiled under docket #51.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #51 Defendant's Amended Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant NORTHFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY is hereby granted leave to file the First Amended Answer which has been tendered to the Court as Exhibit 1 to Defendants Amended Motion for Leave. The Clerk is directed to file Defendants First Amended Answer attached as Exhibit 1 to Defendants Amended Motion entered by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ju) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #51 Amended MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by WTL Oil, LLC. (Carollo, Amanda) Modified on 8/11/2021 (rg). (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason F. DeSouza for J. Scott Frederick ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13690362) by on behalf of Juan Rede. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Supplement Supreme Court of TX Letter, #3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(DeSouza, Jason) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason F. DeSouza for Robert Evans ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13690018) by on behalf of Juan Rede. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion Pro Hac Vice, #2 Supplement Letter of Good Standing)(DeSouza, Jason) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plains Marketing, L.P.. (Krudop, Erik) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plains All American Pipeline, L.P.. (Krudop, Erik) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WTL Oil, LLC. (Hokenson, Greg) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) by Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Marketing, L.P.. (Krudop, Erik) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter to attorney J. Scott Frederick for Juan Rede. (rg) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WTL Oil, LLC (Filing fee Paid $400 Receipt #0542-13657967), filed by WTL Oil, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Appendix Index of Matters Being Filed, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A, A-1 to A-15, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B Consent to Removal)(Hokenson, Greg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mammoth Energy Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Plains All American Pipeline L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where PLAINS MARKETING, L.P. A TEXAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert B. Evans, III