This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/16/2022 at 14:40:51 (UTC).

Reddy v. Space Exploration Technologies Corp.

Case Summary

On November 01, 2021, Ajay Reddy (“Plaintiff”), represented by G. Ware Cornell, Jr. of Cornell & Associates, PA, filed a civil lawsuit against Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (“SpaceX” or “Defendant”), seeking damages, a judgement for economic losses sustained by the Defendant, costs of action and other equitable reliefs for the Defendant’s alleged racial and national origin discrimination as well as retaliation under the FCRA. This case was filed in U.S District Court in the Middle District of Florida with Judge Anne C. Conway and Judge Embry J. Kidd presiding.

In this complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “REDDY was a fairing recovery engineer at SpaceX from October 28, 2019 to May 29, 2020. Plaintiff was the only Asian fairing recovery engineer.” And that, “Two white engineers were hired shortly before Plaintiff. Andrew Derhammer was transferred into fairing recovery from another position. Karl Burnett, like Plaintiff, was a fresh hire. Because of the novel and unique nature of the fairing recovery program, all three engineers were unfamiliar with its specific techniques. Burnett was given several days of training in California on the fairing recovery schema and thus acquired critical knowledge on how to perform his job. Prior to his transfer, Derhammer had access to engineers who designed the system and also acquired specialized knowledge. In contrast, REDDY was not given this or similar training. Later, SpaceX claimed that Burnett flew across the country so that he could review documentation relating to the system.” 

Plaintiff further alleged, “Throughout his time at SpaceX, REDDY was subjected to pervasive and severe harassment, including (but not limited to) wanton ridicule, intimidation, interference with his performance, and false statements about his performance. Plaintiff often complained about the above to his management, which was indifferent and refused to take any corrective action. This harassment and discrimination, in flagrant violation of corporate and federal policies and standards, markedly changed the terms and conditions of Plaintiff’s employment.”

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Having exhausted all other options, Plaintiff then made verbal and written complaints to Human Resources about the harassment he was subjected to and management’s refusal to correct the same, the disparate treatment he received from management, and how his lack of training was hampering his work performance. He hoped to receive the information he needed to excel at his job, and end the harassment and disparate treatment he faced.”

The Plaintiff went on to allege that “According to SpaceX’s position statement to the EEOC, REDDY’s final manager, Robert Hill, then terminated his employment based on claims that during a group interview event, Plaintiff “ma[de] facial expressions in reaction to answers the candidate provided[.]” SpaceX claims that these alleged expressions made the candidate “feel uncomfortable.” The Plaintiff then alleged that, “this bizarre pretext, that Plaintiff made someone feel uncomfortable with his face, is both a fabrication and a declaration of animus towards Plaintiff’s appearance.”

There are five claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim alleged is for violation of the race discrimination provisions of the FCRA and §1981. The second claim alleged is for violation of the national origin discrimination provisions of the FCRA. The third claim alleged is for violation of the race discrimination provisions of the FCRA and §1981 and discrimination on the basis of race. The fourth claim alleged is for altering the terms and conditions of employment in violation of the FCRA and §1981. The fifth claim alleged is for breach of contract.

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to pass an order for restitutionary and compensatory damages, reasonable attorney’s fees and expert fees as provided by the FCRA and 42 U.S.C. §1988, entry of judgment for economic losses, costs of action and such other equitable reliefs as the Court may deem proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01821

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne C. Conway

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ajay Reddy

Defendant

Space Exploration Technologies Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

G. Ware Cornell, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

Kimberly Rivera

Jessica Theresa Travers

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) (incorrect event used) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Space Exploration Technologies Corp. with Jury Demand. filed by Ajay Reddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, G.) Modified on 11/2/2021 (TNP). (Entered: 11/01/2021)

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 11/3/2021. ctp (PML) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#4

(#4) INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/3/2021. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cornell, G.) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

5 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

5 #2

Proposed Summons

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (TNP) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER directing Plaintiff's compliance to Initial Case Order #4 within 14 days from the date of this order. Failure to respond shall result in sanctions being imposed upon counsel. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/29/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION [JOINT] to stay action pending binding arbitration by Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Rivera, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER Staying Case #8. The case is stayed pending the completion of arbitration. Defendant is directed to file and serve on or before 3/1/22 and every 3 months thereafter a status report. Clerk shall terminate any pending motions/deadlines and administratively close the case. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/8/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#10

(#10) DEFENDANT'S STATUS REPORT on Arbitration by Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Rivera, Kimberly) Text modified on 3/2/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#11

(#11) PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT by Ajay Reddy. (Cornell, G.) Text modified on 3/2/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#12

(#12) STATUS report on Arbitration by Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Rivera, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

3 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STATUS report on Arbitration by Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Rivera, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT by Ajay Reddy. (Cornell, G.) Text modified on 3/2/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFENDANT'S STATUS REPORT on Arbitration by Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Rivera, Kimberly) Text modified on 3/2/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketSet deadlines: Status Report due by 3/1/2022 and every three months thereafter. (SPM) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Staying Case #8. The case is stayed pending the completion of arbitration. Defendant is directed to file and serve on or before 3/1/22 and every 3 months thereafter a status report. Clerk shall terminate any pending motions/deadlines and administratively close the case. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/8/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION [JOINT] to stay action pending binding arbitration by Space Exploration Technologies Corp.. (Rivera, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER directing Plaintiff's compliance to Initial Case Order #4 within 14 days from the date of this order. Failure to respond shall result in sanctions being imposed upon counsel. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/29/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (TNP) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketFEES paid by Ajay Reddy (Filing fee $402 receipt number ORL101048) (ARJ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cornell, G.) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/3/2021. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 11/3/2021. ctp (PML) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-1821-ACC-EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) (incorrect event used) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Space Exploration Technologies Corp. with Jury Demand. filed by Ajay Reddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, G.) Modified on 11/2/2021 (TNP). (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less