This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2022 at 07:17:51 (UTC).

REDDICK v. BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 REDDICK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05075

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEANETTE REDDICK

Glenside, PA 19038

Defendants and Cross Claimants

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

BURLINGTON STORES, INC.

EXCEL ELEVATOR & ESCALATOR CORP.

TRESTLE PARTNERS LP

THE GALMAN GROUP LTD.

TK ELEVATOR CORPORATION

3PHASE ELEVATORS

THE GALMAN GROUP

GALMAN GROUP LTD.

TK ELEVTARO CORPORATION

BURLINGTON COAT STORES, INC.

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE OF JENKINTOWN, INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

EXCEL ELEVATOR & ESCALATOR CORP.

TRESTLE PARTNERS LP

3PHASE ELEVATORS

THE GALMAN GROUP

TK ELEVTARO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVAN DYER

Attorney at Rosen Justice

1650 Market Streetsuite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

JOHN T. ASHER, III

Attorney at SPECTOR GADON & ROSEN, P.C.

1635 Market Street7Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER RE: MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/21/2021. 12/21/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTION TO REMAND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/21/2021. 12/21/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#8

(#8) Sur-Reply in Opposition re #3 First MOTION to Remand to Common Pleas , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION, BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE OF JENKINTOWN, INC., BURLINGTON COAT STORES, INC., BURLINGTON STORES, INC.. (ASHER, JOHN) Modified on 12/6/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#7

(#7) Brief in Support re #3 First MOTION to Remand to Common Pleas filed by JEANETTE REDDICK. (DYER, EVAN) Modified on 12/6/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 First MOTION to Remand to Common Pleas filed by BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION, BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE OF JENKINTOWN, INC., BURLINGTON COAT STORES, INC.. (ASHER, JOHN) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses of Defendants Burlington Stores, Inc. and Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation to the Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Jeanette Reddick with Cross-Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 13 , CROSSCLAIM against 3PHASE ELEVATORS, EXCEL ELEVATOR & ESCALATOR CORP., THE GALMAN GROUP, TK ELEVTARO CORPORATION, TRESTLE PARTNERS LP by BURLINGTON STORES, INC., BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION, BURLINGTON COAT STORES, INC., BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE OF JENKINTOWN, INC..(ASHER, JOHN) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibits

3 #3

Main Document

2 #1

Arbitration Certification Form

2 #2

Main Document

1 #5

Exhibit G-I

1 #4

Exhibit D-F

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RE: MOTION TO REMAND IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/21/2021. 12/21/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTION TO REMAND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/21/2021. 12/21/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Sur-Reply in Opposition re #3 First MOTION to Remand to Common Pleas , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION, BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE OF JENKINTOWN, INC., BURLINGTON COAT STORES, INC., BURLINGTON STORES, INC.. (ASHER, JOHN) Modified on 12/6/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Brief in Support re #3 First MOTION to Remand to Common Pleas filed by JEANETTE REDDICK. (DYER, EVAN) Modified on 12/6/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 First MOTION to Remand to Common Pleas filed by BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION, BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE OF JENKINTOWN, INC., BURLINGTON COAT STORES, INC.. (ASHER, JOHN) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses of Defendants Burlington Stores, Inc. and Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation to the Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Jeanette Reddick with Cross-Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 13 , CROSSCLAIM against 3PHASE ELEVATORS, EXCEL ELEVATOR & ESCALATOR CORP., THE GALMAN GROUP, TK ELEVTARO CORPORATION, TRESTLE PARTNERS LP by BURLINGTON STORES, INC., BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION, BURLINGTON COAT STORES, INC., BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE OF JENKINTOWN, INC..(ASHER, JOHN) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County. (kw, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First MOTION to Remand to Common Pleas filed by JEANETTE REDDICK.Memorandum, Brief, Affidavit, Declaration, Certificate of Counsel or Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(DYER, EVAN) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, ) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BURLINGTON STORES, INC., BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CPAEDC-15556493), filed by BURLINGTON STORES, INC., BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-F, #5 Exhibit G-I)(ASHER, JOHN) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Excel Elevator & Escalator Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where TK ELEVATOR CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON STORES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION is a litigant