This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2019 at 08:29:36 (UTC).

Red v. Nevels et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Red against Nevels in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00358

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James T Moody

Referral Judge

John E Martin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Red

Marion, IN 46952

Defendants

Corporal Sugar

Reggie Nevels

Todd Fleece

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Red. (shk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Envelope

1 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the Fort Wayne Division. ***Civil Case Terminated. New Fort Wayne Case No. 1:19-cv-00415. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 9/25/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party with copy of new docket)(shk) Modified on 10/7/2019 to add new case number(shk). (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT with 2 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms with Jury Demand against Todd Fleece, Reggie Nevels, Corporal Sugar, filed by Michael Red. (Summons received for Todd Fleece and Reggie Nevels) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope)(shk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the Fort Wayne Division. ***Civil Case Terminated. New Fort Wayne Case No. 1:19-cv-00415. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 9/25/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party with copy of new docket)(shk) Modified on 10/7/2019 to add new case number(shk). (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Red. (shk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT with 2 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms with Jury Demand against Todd Fleece, Reggie Nevels, Corporal Sugar, filed by Michael Red. (Summons received for Todd Fleece and Reggie Nevels) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope)(shk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.