This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 16:21:24 (UTC).

Red Rock Analytics, LLC v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Red Rock Analytics, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00117

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Red Rock Analytics, LLC

Defendants, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Apple Inc.

Red Rock Analytics, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Hon. Layn R Phillips (Ret.)

Corona Del Mar, CA 92625

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Thomas John Ward, Jr

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Leslie V Payne

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

James Boone Baxter

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush, LLP - Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Miranda Yan Jones

Attorney at Porter & Hedges LLP - Houston

1000 Main Street, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002-6336

Robert Allan Bullwinkel

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Michael F Heim

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush, LLP - Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Alden Harris

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Daniel Shaw Young

Attorney at Adsero IP - Littleton

8210 Southpark Terrace

Littleton, CO 80120

Brian E Ferguson

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP - Washington

2001 M Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Daniel Musher

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP - Washington

2001 M Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Ariane Salone Moss

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP - Washington

2001 M Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Kent Thomas Dallow

Attorney at Adsero IP - Littleton

8210 Southpark Terrace

Littleton, CO 80120

Robert Stephen Magee

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP - Redwood Shores

201 Redwood Shores Parkway, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Anne Marie Cappella

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP - Redwood Shores

201 Redwood Shores Parkway, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brian E Ferguson

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP - Washington

2001 M Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Robert Stephen Magee

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP - Redwood Shores

201 Redwood Shores Parkway, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Anne Marie Cappella

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP - Redwood Shores

201 Redwood Shores Parkway, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Thomas John Ward, Jr

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Leslie V Payne

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

James Boone Baxter

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush, LLP - Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Miranda Yan Jones

Attorney at Porter & Hedges LLP - Houston

1000 Main Street, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002-6336

Robert Allan Bullwinkel

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Michael F Heim

Attorney at Heim Payne & Chorush, LLP - Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Alden Harris

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#77

(#77) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#76

(#76) ORDER granting #75 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Red Rocks claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/8/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

75 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#75

(#75) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Alden) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#74

(#74) ORDER granting #73 Motion to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. ORDERED that all proceedings and deadlines in the above-captioned case be STAYED until February 20, 2020. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/21/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

73 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#73

(#73) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Alden) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#72

(#72) Red Rock Analytics, LLC's ANSWER to #71 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Red Rock Analytics, LLC.(Harris, Alden) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#71

(#71) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Red Rock Analytics, LLC by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. c/o CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Payne, Leslie) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement

1 #2

Exhibit B - Jury Demand

1 #1

Exhibit A - US 7,346,313

#1

(#71) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Red Rock Analytics, LLC by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

158 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ORDER granting #75 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Red Rocks claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/8/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Alden) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ORDER granting #73 Motion to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. ORDERED that all proceedings and deadlines in the above-captioned case be STAYED until February 20, 2020. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/21/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Alden) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Red Rock Analytics, LLC's ANSWER to #71 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Red Rock Analytics, LLC.(Harris, Alden) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Red Rock Analytics, LLC by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) P.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Harris, Alden) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) REDACTION to #68 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alden Harris, #2 Exhibit M)(Harris, Alden) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) SEALED SUR-REPLY in Opposition to #53 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alden Harris, #2 Exhibit M)(Harris, Alden) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alden Harris on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Harris, Alden) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Allan Bullwinkel on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Bullwinkel, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Red Rock Analytics, LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. c/o CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (klc, ) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Payne, Leslie) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7222802.), filed by Red Rock Analytics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 7,346,313, #2 Exhibit B - Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit C - Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Payne, Leslie) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alden Harris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Allan Bullwinkel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie V Payne