This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:21:20 (UTC).

RED MOUNTAIN COLLECTIONS, LLC v. STUDNER

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 RED MOUNTAIN COLLECTIONS, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STUDNER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05719

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED MOUNTAIN COLLECTIONS, LLC

Defendant

WENDALYN STUDNER

Philadelphia, PA 19118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRIE D. WALLACE

Attorney at MENDELSON LAW FIRM

799 Estate Place, P.O. Box 17235

Memphis, TN 38187

JENNIFER HILLER-NIMEROFF

Attorney at WEIR & PARTNERS

The Widener Building, Suite 500, 1339 Chestnut Street

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, In the Alternative, To Strike Notice of Removal filed by RED MOUNTAIN COLLECTIONS, LLC.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Certificate of Service)(HILLER-NIMEROFF, JENNIFER) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RED MOUNTAIN COLLECTIONS, LLC re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, In the Alternative, To Strike Notice of Removal Amended Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HILLER-NIMEROFF, JENNIFER) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

3 #2

Memorandum

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal filed by WENDALYN STUDNER from Chancery Court of Noxubee County, Mississippi, case number 19-54, Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $400 receipt number PPE207803)(mbh, )(No envelope included) Modified on 12/9/2019 (mbh, ). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 #4

Exhibit B

3 #3

Exhibit A

3 #5

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mbh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

3 #6

Certificate of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RED MOUNTAIN COLLECTIONS, LLC re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, In the Alternative, To Strike Notice of Removal Amended Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HILLER-NIMEROFF, JENNIFER) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, In the Alternative, To Strike Notice of Removal filed by RED MOUNTAIN COLLECTIONS, LLC.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Certificate of Service)(HILLER-NIMEROFF, JENNIFER) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mbh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal filed by WENDALYN STUDNER from Chancery Court of Noxubee County, Mississippi, case number 19-54, Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $400 receipt number PPE207803)(mbh, )(No envelope included) Modified on 12/9/2019 (mbh, ). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.