This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2020 at 08:45:33 (UTC).

Recycled Paper International, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Recycled Paper International, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James I. Cohn and William Matthewman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-81888

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James I. Cohn

Referral Judge

William Matthewman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Recycled Paper International, LLC

Defendants

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Mario D. German Law Center, P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lance Wayne Shinder

Attorney at Black Srebnick Korns

One Town Center Road, 201, Ste 210, 33486

Boca Raton, FL 33486

Kyle A. Johnson

Attorney at Black, Srebnick, Kornspan & Stumpf, P.A.

Defendant Attorneys

Lindsay Laura Macdonald

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

777 S. Flagler Drive, Suite 300 East

West Palm Beach, FL 33418

Courtney M Keller

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

450 South Orange Avenue, Suite 650

Orlando, FL 32801

Mario Danilo German

Attorney at Mario D German Law Center P.A.

55 Ne Fifth Ave, Suite 501

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File ITs Reply In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint re #28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 12/21/2020 (Keller, Courtney) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#42

(#42) RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2020. (Shinder, Lance) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#41

(#41) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Keller, Courtney) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Striking #36 Notice (Other) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Keller, Courtney) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#37

(#37) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading to complaint by Mario D. German Law Center, P.A.. Responses due by 12/14/2020 (German, Mario) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#36

(#36) STRICKEN per DE #40 . NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Keller, Courtney) Modified on 12/1/2020 (pcs). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#35

(#35) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC. (Shinder, Lance) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#28

(#42) RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2020. (Shinder, Lance) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#17

(#42) RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2020. (Shinder, Lance) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Wayne Shinder on behalf of Recycled Paper International, LLC (Shinder, Lance) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Responses due by 10/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shinder, Lance) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS: (Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 7/15/2021 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 10/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Civil Cover Sheet (Keller, Courtney) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#5

(#5) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kyle A. Johnson, mailing date October 9, 2020, (pt) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#6) NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Civil Cover Sheet (Keller, Courtney) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File ITs Reply In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint re #28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 12/21/2020 (Keller, Courtney) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #17 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2020. (Shinder, Lance) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Keller, Courtney) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Striking #36 Notice (Other) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Keller, Courtney) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Clerks Notice to Filer re #36 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement event and ensure all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents are entered. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #37 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Mario D. German Law Center, P.A., shall answer the Complaint on or before December 10, 2020. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/30/20.(rwr) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading to complaint by Mario D. German Law Center, P.A.. Responses due by 12/14/2020 (German, Mario) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) STRICKEN per DE #40 . NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Keller, Courtney) Modified on 12/1/2020 (pcs). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by Recycled Paper International, LLC. (Shinder, Lance) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Mario D. German Law Center, P.A., shall answer the Complaint on or before November 30, 2020. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 11/16/20.(rwr) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM VIDEO TELECONFERENCE (VTC): (Scheduling Conference via Zoom Video set for 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Wayne Shinder on behalf of Recycled Paper International, LLC (Shinder, Lance) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Recycled Paper International, LLC. Responses due by 10/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shinder, Lance) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL AND TRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE FOR SCHEDULING MATTERS AND PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS: (Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Senior Judge James I. Cohn., Calendar Call set for 7/15/2021 09:00 AM before Senior Judge James I. Cohn.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James I. Cohn on 10/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Civil Cover Sheet (Keller, Courtney) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kyle A. Johnson, mailing date October 9, 2020, (pt) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect Party Role Selected. The Filer failed to select the correct party role. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James I. Cohn. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13667662, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Keller, Courtney) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 10/9/2020 (pcs). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtney M. Keller