This case was last updated from PACER on 06/11/2021 at 19:16:21 (UTC).

Reclaim: Leroy Jeffrey Stansberry et al v. Refiled U.S Criminal Justice Dept Attorney General Ganlanc, etc et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Reclaim Leroy Jeffrey Stansberry filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Refiled U S Criminal Justice Dept Attorney General Ganlanc, etc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ralph R. Beistline. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ralph R. Beistline

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Natasha

Darryl

Reclaim: Leroy Jeffrey Stansberry

Anchorage, AK 99501

Pamela

Jones

Defendants

OPA App FBI

Herman Jr. Walker

Refiled U.S Criminal Justice Dept Attorney General Ganlanc, etc

Fleur L Roberts

Rex L. Butler

Gov's Dunleavy

OVR Hanes

Burgess

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/10/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This case is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court shall enter a judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/10/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Lee Roy J. Stansberry re #3 . Service for the NEF of the returned mail will not be redistributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER RE DEFICIENT FILING: Mr. Stansberry must file a complaint in conformance with the applicable rules of court within 30 days of the date of this order and must either pay the filing fee or file the application to waive prepayment of the filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/26/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#2

(#2) Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Reclaim: Leroy Jeffrey Stansberry re #1 . Service for the NEF of the returned mail will not be redistributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT The Alaska Court of Appeals Default Notice Due For Ratification Habeas Corpus Acquitted Decisions by Attorney General on 21th April 2021 against All Defendants, filed by Reclaim: Leroy Jeffrey Stansberry.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/10/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This case is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court shall enter a judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/10/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Lee Roy J. Stansberry re #3 . Service for the NEF of the returned mail will not be redistributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER RE DEFICIENT FILING: Mr. Stansberry must file a complaint in conformance with the applicable rules of court within 30 days of the date of this order and must either pay the filing fee or file the application to waive prepayment of the filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/26/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to Reclaim: Leroy Jeffrey Stansberry re #1 . Service for the NEF of the returned mail will not be redistributed to the addressee. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT The Alaska Court of Appeals Default Notice Due For Ratification Habeas Corpus Acquitted Decisions by Attorney General on 21th April 2021 against All Defendants, filed by Reclaim: Leroy Jeffrey Stansberry.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Darryl is a litigant

Latest cases where NATASHA is a litigant

Latest cases where PAMELA A FERNANDEZSMITH AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST TO BE ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF RENEE E DOLLIVER is a litigant

Latest cases where BURGESS is a litigant